Anzhelya Makaryan v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-05086 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 07, 2018 12:26 AM PST |
Defendant
Audi AG
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anzhelya Makaryan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago |
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 11/29 5:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Anzhelya Makaryan. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 11/14 11:29 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 41 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): Document is described as a Memorandum of Points of Authorities but the document image is labeled a Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Mon 11/13 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/18/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Winterman, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Altine Decl., | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. A1 to Altine Decl., | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh. A2 to Altine Decl., | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh. A3 to Altine Decl., | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh. B to Altine Decl., | ||
Att: 7 Declaration Alayoubi Decl., | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint | ||
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 11/06 5:36 PM
Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class 27 filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(Winterman, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Michael Gallub, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Michael Gallub Decl., | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Michael Gallub Decl., | ||
Att: 4 Declaration Alan Altine, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A-1 to Alan Altine Decl., | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A-2 to Alan Altine Decl., | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit A-3 to Alan Altine Decl., | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit B to Alan Altine Decl., | ||
Att: 9 Declaration Kareem Alayoubi, | ||
Att: 10 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Mon 10/30 1:59 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against against All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by plaintiff Anzhelya Makaryan(Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/24 9:18 AM
ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting36 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Chase APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Volkswagen Group of America Inc., et al., designating Craig L. Winterman as local counsel. (mrgo) |
|
37 | 37
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Tue 10/24 9:14 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Chase to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20695949)32 by Judge Percy Anderson. The document is stricken. Counsel refiled an amended application as document No. 36. (cr) |
|
36 | 36
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 10/23 10:27 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Chase to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 10/20/2017, Receipt No. 097320695949) filed by defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Winterman, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Fri 10/20 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Chase to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20695949)32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 10/20 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Chase to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20695949)32(Winterman, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice | ||
33 | 33
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 10/20 1:35 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Chase to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20695949)32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (kss) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 10/20 11:36 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Chase to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20695949) filed by defendant Volkswagen Group of America, In c.. (Winterman, Craig) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Tue 10/17 9:40 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND FURTHER BRIEFING by Judge Percy Anderson19 : The time within which VWGoA may file its response to Plaintiff's motion for class certification is extended until and including November 6, 2017; the time within which Plaintiff may file a reply is extended until and including November 20, 2017. Upon the filing of the reply, that matter will be deemed under submission. The Court will notify the parties if the Court desires oral argument. (cr) Modified on 10/17/2017 (cr) |
|
29 | 29
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 10/16 2:48 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File response filed by defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(Winterman, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND FURTHER BRIEFING, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND FURTHER BRIEFING | ||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Dismiss Case
Tue 10/17 10:30 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss19 is granted. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint must be filed on or before October 30, 2017. The failure to file an Amended Complaint by that date may result in the dismissal of this action. Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. (cr) |
|
28 | 28
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 10/13 8:28 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: On the Courts own motion, MOTION to Dismiss Case19 currently set for hearing on October 16, 2017 is hereby VACATED. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Certify Class Action
Thu 10/12 5:49 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by plaintiff Anzhelya Makaryan. Motion set for hearing on 11/13/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Hovanes Margarian in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Hovanes Margarian, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Hovanes Margarian, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Hovanes Margarian, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Hovanes Margarian, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Hovanes Margarian, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Hovanes Margarian, | ||
Att: 8 Declaration of Aleksey Sirotin in Support, | ||
Att: 9 Declaration of Anzhelya Makaryan in Support, | ||
Att: 10 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Anzhelya Makaryan's Motion for Class Certification | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 10/10 11:37 AM
Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.3.1, documents filed electronically must be submitted in Portable Document Format ("PDF"), created using word-processing software, and published to PDF from the original word-processing file to permit the electronic version of the document to be searched. Other than signature pages, PDF IMAGES CREATED BY SCANNING PAPER DOCUMENTS ARE PROHIBITED. Violation of Local Rule 5-4.3.1 may result in the striking of the offending document and the imposition of monetary or other sanctions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/03 3:46 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Percy Anderson: Granting22 Non-Resident Attorney Michael B. Gallub APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., et al., designating Craig L. Winterman as local counsel. (cr) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 10/02 2:51 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 19 filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Winterman, Craig) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Extension of Time to File
Tue 10/03 11:31 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Percy Anderson. Before the Court is an Ex Parte Application to Extend Plaintiff Anzhelya Makaryan's Time to File Motion for Class Certification21 filed on September 28, 2017. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Ex parte relief is not warranted because Plaintiff fails to demonstrate that she is not at fault for creating the crisis that requires ex parte relief. Moreover, setting aside the procedural aspects of the instant application, Plaintiff fails to demonstrate that she is entitled to an extension. Based on the foregoing, Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application (Docket No. 21) is denied. See document for details. (smo) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 09/29 12:56 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael B. Gallub to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20587201) filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, I nc.. (Winterman, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 09/28 4:03 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification filed by plaintiff Anzhelya Makaryan. (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Hovanes Margarian in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting the Application | ||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 09/25 3:04 PM
Plaintiff's OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 19 filed by Plaintiff Anzhelya Makaryan. (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 09/18 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/16/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Winterman, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration George Blake, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 08/24 11:04 AM
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., (Winterman, Craig) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Mon 08/21 11:09 AM
ORDER DENYING STIPULATION EXTENDING PLAINTIFF ANZHELYA MAKARYAN'S TIME TO FILE A MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File16 . (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 08/17 10:24 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Class Certification filed by plaintiff Anzhelya Makaryan.(Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Fri 07/28 4:03 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.'S TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Judge Percy Anderson re: Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days),14 . Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s answer due 9/18/2017. (mrgo) |
|
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Thu 07/27 2:48 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 18, 2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(Attorney Craig L Winterman added to party Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Winterman, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Tue 07/18 10:05 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order12 : STANDING ORDER belongs to a different case and was erroneously filed in this matter. (cr) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Tue 07/18 9:54 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. (cr) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order
Tue 07/18 9:37 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 07/17 6:18 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anzhelya Makaryan, upon Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 7/14/2017, answer due 8/4/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC - Bill Jacobs - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Fri 07/14 2:16 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16-cv-00336 PA(KSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim and Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-05086 PA(KSx). Signed by Judge Percy Anderson (rn) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 07/12 11:33 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (car) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 07/12 11:11 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 07/12 11:11 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Tue 07/11 12:09 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Anzhelya Makaryan. (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Related Case(s)
Tue 07/11 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Anzhelya Makaryan. Related Case(s): 2:16-cv-00336-PA-KS (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 07/11 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anzhelya Makaryan, identifying All persons within the United States who purchased or leased, or will purchase or lease, an Audi vehicle with the Start/Stop system, on or after the date Defendants placed said vehicles into the stream of commerce.. (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 07/11 11:58 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anzhelya Makaryan. (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 07/11 11:54 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20159104 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Anzhelya Makaryan. (Attorney Hovanes Margarian added to party Anzhelya Makaryan(pty:pla))(Margarian, Hovanes) |