CASE NUMBER NOT USED
Washington Western District Court | |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-01042 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 07, 2018 12:31 AM PST |
Defendant
Robert Ferguson
|
|
Defendant
Tina R Robinson
|
|
Plaintiff
Richard Lee Rynearson, III
|
Represented By
|
1. | Man files lawsuit against AG Bob Ferguson and Tina Robinson over Washington's cyberstalking law (seattletimes.com) |
Submitted Thu 07/13/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 07/12 1:48 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. Incorrect divisional office selected by filer. See 3:17-cv-5531-RBL for all filings in this matter. (RE) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/11 3:37 PM
ORDER re2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eugene Volokh for Richard Lee Rynearson, III, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA) |
|
4 | 4
respm
Declaration
Tue 07/11 3:34 PM
DECLARATION of Richard Lee Rynearson, III filed by Plaintiff Richard Lee Rynearson, III re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Balasubramani, Venkat) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Tue 07/11 3:32 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff Richard Lee Rynearson, III. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 8/4/2017, (Balasubramani, Venkat) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/11 2:59 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eugene Volokh FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Richard Lee Rynearson, III (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4939179 (Balasubramani, Venkat) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/11 2:26 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Robert Ferguson, Tina R Robinson Attorney Venkat Balasubramani added to party Richard Lee Rynearson, III(pty:pla), filed by Richard Lee Rynearson, III.(Balasubramani, Venkat) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |