New York Southern District Court
Judge:Naomi Reice Buchwald
Case #: 1:17-cv-05205
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331cv Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2017
Terminated:May 23, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Jan 07, 2018 3:50 AM EST
Amicus
Amici Curiae Federal Courts Scholars
Represented By
Andrew Kim
Goodwin Procter, Llp (dc)
contact info
Brian Timothy Burgess
Goodwin Procter, Llp (dc)
contact info
Amicus
Amici First Amendment Scholars
Represented By
Joshua Alexander Geltzer
Institute For Constitutional Advocacy And Protection
contact info
Amicus
Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By
Mitchell L. Stoltz
Electronic Frontier Foundation
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Scavino
Represented By
Michael Hendry Baer
U.S. Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Daniel Halainen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Sean M Spicer
Represented By
Michael Hendry Baer
U.S. Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Daniel Halainen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Donald J. Trump
Represented By
Michael Hendry Baer
U.S. Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Daniel Halainen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebecca Buckwalter
Represented By
Katherine Amy Fallow
Knight First Amendment Institute At Columbia University
contact info
Jameel Jaffer
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (nyc)
contact info
Alexander Abraham Abdo
Knight First Amendement Institute At Columbia University
contact info
Plaintiff
Philip Cohen
Represented By
Katherine Amy Fallow
Knight First Amendment Institute At Columbia University
contact info
Jameel Jaffer
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (nyc)
contact info
Alexander Abraham Abdo
Knight First Amendement Institute At Columbia University
contact info
Plaintiff
Holly Figueroa
Represented By
Katherine Amy Fallow
Knight First Amendment Institute At Columbia University
contact info
Jameel Jaffer
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (nyc)
contact info
Alexander Abraham Abdo
Knight First Amendement Institute At Columbia University
contact info
Plaintiff
Eugene Gu
Represented By
Katherine Amy Fallow
Knight First Amendment Institute At Columbia University
contact info
Jameel Jaffer
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (nyc)
contact info
Alexander Abraham Abdo
Knight First Amendement Institute At Columbia University
contact info
Plaintiff
Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Represented By
Katherine Amy Fallow
Knight First Amendment Institute At Columbia University
contact info
Jessica Ring Amunson
Jenner & Block, Llp (dc)
contact info
Tassity S. Johnson
Jenner & Block, Llp (dc)
contact info
Jameel Jaffer
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (nyc)
contact info
Alexander Abraham Abdo
Knight First Amendement Institute At Columbia University
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon Neely
Represented By
Katherine Amy Fallow
Knight First Amendment Institute At Columbia University
contact info
Jameel Jaffer
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (nyc)
contact info
Alexander Abraham Abdo
Knight First Amendement Institute At Columbia University
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Papp
Represented By
Katherine Amy Fallow
Knight First Amendment Institute At Columbia University
contact info
Jameel Jaffer
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (nyc)
contact info
Alexander Abraham Abdo
Knight First Amendement Institute At Columbia University
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas Pappas
Represented By
Katherine Amy Fallow
Knight First Amendment Institute At Columbia University
contact info
Jameel Jaffer
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (nyc)
contact info
Alexander Abraham Abdo
Knight First Amendement Institute At Columbia University
contact info


1. Judge Rules Trump Can?t Block People on Twitter (bloomberg.com)
Submitted Thu 05/24/2018
2. Twitter users file lawsuit against Trump after being blocked from his account (cnet.com)
Submitted Wed 07/12/2017
Docket last updated: 10/21/2018 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 26, 2018
74 74 misc Letter Wed 10:10 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Chad Joseph, dated 6/21/18 re: DOCUMENT 72, MEMORANDUM & ORDER KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY ET AL. V. DONALD J. TRUMP ET AL. Document filed by Chad Joseph, a non-party. (sc) Modified on 6/27/2018 (sc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Mon 10:58 AM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 74 LETTER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (tro)
Related: [-]