District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Royce C Lamberth
Case #: 1:17-cv-01361
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Aug 26, 2017 5:19 AM EDT
Defendant
TODD T. SEMONITE
Represented By
Joseph Thomas Mathews
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Dedra Seibel Curteman
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Heather E. Gange
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
ROBERT M. SPEER
Represented By
Joseph Thomas Mathews
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Dedra Seibel Curteman
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Heather E. Gange
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
VIRGINIA ELECTRIC AND POWER COMPANY
Represented By
Eric J. Murdock
Hunton & Williams LLP
contact info
Harry M. Johnson, III
Hunton & Williams, LLP
contact info
Movant
AMERICAN RIVERS, INC.
Represented By
Tyler Joseph Sniff
Stack & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Movant
COALITION TO PROTECT AMERICA'S NATIONAL PARKS, INC.
Represented By
Tyler Joseph Sniff
Stack & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Movant
JONATHAN B. JARVIS
Represented By
Tyler Joseph Sniff
Stack & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By
William Lawton
Meyer Glitzenstein & Eubanks LLP
contact info
William Stewart Eubanks, II
Meyer Glitzenstein & Eubanks LLP
contact info
Eric Robert Glitzenstein
Meyer Glitzenstein & Eubanks LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 20 2017
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re Order 59. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/20/17. (lsj)
Docket last updated: 11/17/2017 11:59 PM EST
Friday, November 17, 2017
66 66 misc Stipulation Fri 12:59 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Scheduling Order by TODD T. SEMONITE, ROBERT M. SPEER.(Mathews, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order