District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Ellen S Huvelle
Case #: 1:17-cv-01370
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause48:1985 Conspiracy/Deprivation Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Aug 26, 2017 6:31 AM EDT
Defendant
DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.
Represented By
Michael A. Carvin
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
ROGER STONE
Represented By
Robert C. Buschel
Buschel Gibbons, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
ERIC SCHOENBERG
Represented By
Benjamin Leon Berwick
The Protect Democracy Project
contact info
Plaintiff
ROY COCKRUM
Represented By
Benjamin Leon Berwick
The Protect Democracy Project
contact info
Plaintiff
SCOTT COMER
Represented By
Benjamin Leon Berwick
The Protect Democracy Project
contact info

Docket last updated: 11/17/2017 11:59 PM EST
Wednesday, October 25, 2017
23 23 motion Dismiss Wed 8:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss under the D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act by ROGER STONE(Buschel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
22 22 motion Dismiss Wed 8:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by ROGER STONE(Buschel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 motion Dismiss Wed 3:28 PM
MOTION to Dismiss under the D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.(Carvin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
20 20 motion Dismiss Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 3:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.(Carvin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - May 5, 2016 email,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - May 21, 2016 email,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Washington Post article,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - April 24, 2016 email,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - New York Times article,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Huffington Post article,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - April 28, 2016 email,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - May 22, 2016 email,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - May 6, 2016 email,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - April 25, 2016 email,
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - May 24, 2016 email,
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex. 12 - May 10, 2016 email,
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex. 13 - May 17, 2016 email,
Att: 14 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, October 02, 2017
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Briefing Schedule Mon 10:28 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re17 Amended Complaint , Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG(Berwick, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 11:59 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: All Defendants; granting19 Motion for Briefing Schedule; Set/Reset Deadlines: The Court hereby GRANTS the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time for defendants' to Respond to the Amended Complaint and for Entry of Briefing Schedule. It is hereby ORDERED that: defendants shall respond to the Amended Complaint on or before October 25, 2017. If defendants move to dismiss the Amended Complaint (including by filing anti-SLAPP motions), plaintiffs shall file their response to such motion(s) on or before December 1, 2017, and defendants shall reply on or before December 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 2, 2017. (lcesh1)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 2:23 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 12/1/2017. Reply due by 12/18/2017. (gdf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2017
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vivek Suri on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. (Suri, Vivek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2017
order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 9:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER finding as moot12 13 14 15 defendants' motions to dismiss in light of plaintiffs' filing of an17 Amended Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)1)(B). Defendants' responses to the Amended Complaint are due by October 11, 2017. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 27, 2017. (AG)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 10:31 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' responses to the Amended Complaint are due by 10/11/2017. (jl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2017
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., ROGER STONE with Jury Demand filed by ROY COCKRUM, ERIC SCHOENBERG, SCOTT COMER.(Berwick, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2017
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11:09 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey Baltruzak, :Firm- Jones Day, :Address- 500 Grant Street, Pittsburgh PA 15219. Phone No. - 412-394-7909. Fax No. - 412-394-7959 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5109872. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.(Carvin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 7:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: It is ordered that the above-referenced motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Jeffrey Baltruzak is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 11, 2017. (AG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2017
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 10:14 AM
Filing fee Paid: $ 100.00, receipt number 4616086977 pursuant to10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice regarding Attorney Name Grant J. Smith. (md)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
15 15 motion Dismiss Tue 8:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss under the D.C. Anti-SLAPP by ROGER STONE(Buschel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 recent unpublished opinion,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
14 14 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 8:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ROGER STONE(Buschel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
13 13 motion Dismiss Tue 2:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss under the D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.(Carvin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 2:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.(Carvin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - May 5, 2016 email,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - May 21, 2016 email,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Washington Post article,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - April 24, 2016 email,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - New York Times article,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Huffington Post article,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - April 28, 2016 email,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - May 22, 2016 email,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - May 6, 2016 email,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - April 25, 2016 email,
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - May 24, 2016 email,
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex. 12 - May 10, 2016 email,
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex. 13 - May 17, 2016 email,
Att: 14 Text of Proposed Order
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 1:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.. (Carvin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2017
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10:45 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Grant J. Smith, :Firm- StrategySmith PA, :Address- 401 Eat Olas Blvd, Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33301. Phone No. - 954.328.9064. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by ROGER STONE(Farkas, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, filed on behalf of Grant J. Smith, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Grant J. Smith be granted leave to appear pro hac vice in the above-captioned case on behalf of Defendant Roger Stone. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 1, 2017. (AG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2017
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by L. Peter Farkas on behalf of ROGER STONE (Farkas, L.)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Buschel on behalf of ROGER STONE (Buschel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 3:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert C. Buschel, :Firm- Buschel Gibbons, PA, :Address- One Financial Plaza, Suite 1300, 100 SE Third Ave, Ft Lauderdale, FL 33394. Phone No. - 9545305301. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5084911. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.(Carvin, Michael) Modified text on 8/22/2017 (td)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 6:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of the above-referenced motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED insofar as Robert C. Buschel is granted leave to participate in court proceedings, as provided for by Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), on behalf of Defendant Roger Stone. Counsel is reminded that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(1) "an attorney who is not a member of the Bar of this Court may file papers only if such attorney joins of record a member in good standing of the Bar of this Court. All papers submitted by non-members of the Bar of this Court must be signed by such counsel and by a member of the Bar of this Court is compliance with this Rule." Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 22, 2017. (AG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2017
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule Tue 9:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and to set Briefing Schedule: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint and for Entry of Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 18, 2017; it is further ORDERED that if Defendants move to dismiss the Complaint, Plaintiffs shall file their response to such motion(s) on or before October 27, 2017, and Defendants shall reply on or before November 10, 2017; and it is further ORDERED that if Plaintiffs amend the Complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B), the parties shall attempt to reach an agreement on a revised schedule and shall submit a joint status report to the Court on or before the date that is seven days after the filing of the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 1, 2017. (AG)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 1:53 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/27/2017. Reply due by 11/10/2017. (gdf)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2017
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Briefing Schedule Mon 5:11 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, , Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG(Berwick, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 service Waiver of Service Mon 5:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE by ROY COCKRUM, ERIC SCHOENBERG, SCOTT COMER. ROGER STONE waiver sent on 7/20/2017, answer due 9/18/2017. (Berwick, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2017
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Mon 10:59 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. served on 7/19/2017, answer due 8/9/2017 (Berwick, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2017
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 12:51 PM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., ROGER STONE. (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(zsb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2017
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 12:03 PM
Case randomly reassigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Judge Amit P. Mehta is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2017
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 9:21 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (sb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2017
1 1 46 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 5:34 PM
COMPLAINT against DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., ROGER STONE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5029062) filed by ROY COCKRUM, ERIC SCHOENBERG, SCOTT COMER.(Berwick, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons