Original Case: 1:12-cv-08617

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv-02408
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2017
Terminated:Apr 11, 2018
Last checked: Thursday Apr 12, 2018 3:34 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
BARNES & NOBLE
Represented By
Allyson Himelfarb
ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP
contact info
Kenneth L. Chernof
ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP
contact info
Peter V. Baugher
BAUGHER DISPUTE RESOLUTION LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
HEATHER DIEFFENBACH
Represented By
Joseph Siprut
SIPRUT PC
contact info
Erich Schork
BARNOW & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Ben Barnow
BARNOW & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SUSAN WINSTEAD
Represented By
Joseph Siprut
SIPRUT PC
contact info
Erich Schork
BARNOW & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Ben Barnow
BARNOW & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info

GPO Apr 11 2018
Filed opinion of the court by Judge Easterbrook. The judgment is VACATED, and the case is REMANDED for proceedings consistent with this opinion. Diane P. Wood, Chief Judge; Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge and David F. Hamilton, Circuit Judge. [6917133-1] [6917133] [17-2408]

1. Barnes & Noble must face renewed data breach lawsuit (reuters.com)
Submitted Thu 04/12/2018
Docket last updated: 04/12/2018 3:32 AM CDT
Wednesday, July 12, 2017
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Heather Dieffenbach and Susan Winstead by 07/18/2017. Transcript information sheet due by 07/26/2017. Appellant's brief due on or before 08/21/2017 for Heather Dieffenbach and Susan Winstead. [1] [6853652] 17-2408 (CR)
Related: [-]