JESMAR ENERGY, INC. v. RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC.
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Lisa Pupo Lenihan |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00928 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Jul 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 09, 2018 3:56 AM EST |
Defendant
RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESMAR ENERGY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 09/04 5:43 PM
ORDER GRANTING the36 Stipulation of Dismissal. The Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case closed Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/04/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/31 12:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by JESMAR ENERGY, INC.. (O'Donnell, Brendan) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Fri 08/17 1:54 PM
ORDER GRANTING the (ECF No.34 ) Joint Motion to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference. The conference, originally set for August 20, 2018 has been rescheduled for September 12, 2018 at 10:00 AM. It will be held in Courtroom 7B before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are not required to file a Stipulation Selecting ADR Process until two days before the new date for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 08/17/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Continue
Thu 08/16 11:54 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC.. (Witzel, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
misc
QC - Proposed Order part of main document
Tue 07/17 2:28 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re32 Motion to Continue. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney Witzel advised that in future proposed orders are to be made separate PDF documents and filed as an attachment to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa) |
||
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Mon 07/16 6:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING the32 Joint Motion to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference. The conference, originally set for August 18, 2018 has been rescheduled for August 20, 2018 at 11:00 AM. It will be held in Courtroom 7B before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are not required to file a Stipulation Selecting ADR Process until two days before the new date for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 07/16/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Continue
Fri 07/13 3:24 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC.. (Witzel, Kenneth) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 06/28 10:01 PM
ORDER that the initial scheduling conference will be held on July 18, 2018, at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 7B, U.S. Post Office and Courthouse Building, 700 Grant Street, Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania. Trial counsel shall attend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file a Rule 26(f) Report no later than two days before the scheduled conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process no later than two days before the scheduled conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 06/28/2018. (jmb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit ADR Form | ||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Mon 05/07 2:49 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (O'Donnell, Brendan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/09 3:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC.. (Witzel, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 03/26 3:55 PM
ORDER denying4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying4 Motion to Compel ; denying4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying4 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 3/26/2018. (vad) |
|
27 | 27
14
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion & Order
Mon 03/26 3:48 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION denying Motion to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration filed by Defendant Range Resources--Appalachia, LLC. [ECF No. 4.] An appropriate Order will follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 3/26/2018. (vad) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 11/27 6:20 PM
ORDER that the (ECF No.25 ) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is DENIED AS MOOT. Attorney Donald T. Dulac is not listed as counsel of record, so withdrawing his appearance is moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/27/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 11/20 5:13 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC.. (Dulac, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
misc
QC - Document incorrectly linked
Fri 11/17 4:21 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re24 Reply to Response to Motion. ERROR: Document incorrectly linked. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa) |
||
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 11/16 2:15 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 Brief in Support of Motion,4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Motion to Compel, filed by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC.. (Witzel, Kenneth) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/07 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan A. O'Donnell on behalf of JESMAR ENERGY, INC.. (O'Donnell, Brendan) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respoth
Response in Opposition
Mon 11/06 4:04 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Motion to Compel,, filed by JESMAR ENERGY, INC.. (Burnett, Robert) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order Lifting Stay Order Response/Briefing Schedule ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 10/16 12:56 PM
ORDER that the stay in this case is lifted and that a response to the (ECF No.4 ) Motion to Dismiss shall be filed no later than November 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/16/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Fri 10/13 10:59 AM
ORDER DENYING the10 Motion to Remand to State Court for the reasons set forth in the Court's Opinion filed this same date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/13/2017. (jmb) |
|
19 | 19
14
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion & Order
Fri 10/13 10:57 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION on the10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1447(c) filed by JESMAR ENERGY, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/13/2017. (jmb) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 08/17 2:59 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1447(c) filed by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC.. (Witzel, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option
Mon 08/07 5:20 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JESMAR ENERGY, INC.. (Burnett, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Response/Briefing Schedule
Mon 08/07 4:15 PM
ORDER that a Response to the10 Motion to Remand to State Court shall be filed no later than August 17, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 08/07/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 08/07 4:14 PM
ORDER that the Motion to Stay (ECF No.14 ) is GRANTED and that all matters in this case are stayed with the exception of the Motion to Remand (ECF No.10 ) and the requirement that counsel file either a consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge or request a District Judge be assigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 08/07/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
misc
QC - Document incorrectly linked
Fri 08/04 4:56 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re14 Motion to Stay. ERROR: Document incorrectly linked. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa) |
||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stay
Thu 08/03 1:58 PM
MOTION to Stay re4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Compel Arbitration by JESMAR ENERGY, INC.. (Burnett, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option
Thu 08/03 1:29 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC.. (Witzel, Kenneth) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1)
Thu 08/03 12:40 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by JESMAR ENERGY, INC.. (Burnett, Robert) |
|
11 | 11
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Thu 08/03 12:38 PM
BRIEF in Support re10 Motion to Remand to State Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1447(c) filed by JESMAR ENERGY, INC.. (Burnett, Robert) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Remand to State Court
Thu 08/03 12:36 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1447(c) by JESMAR ENERGY, INC.. (Burnett, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/27 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Burnett on behalf of JESMAR ENERGY, INC.. (Burnett, Robert) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/27 9:44 AM
ORDER GRANTING the7 Motion for Brandon K. Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 07/27/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) |
|
misc
QC - No Proposed Order Attached
Thu 07/27 2:14 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney Meyer is advised to file a proposed order as a separate PDF document and filed as an attachment to any Motion filed in a civil case. No further action is required as this motion has been ruled on by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa) |
||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
Wed 07/26 3:17 PM
MOTION for attorney Brandon K. Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4409821) by JESMAR ENERGY, INC.. (Meyer, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
misc
QC - Multiple Relief Motion Filed as One Relief
Tue 07/25 3:02 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Motion to Compel. ERROR: MULTIPLE Relief Motion Filed Incorrectly. CORRECTION: Attorney Witzel advised in future that Motions of this nature are to be filed using the Motion Event and clicking on all the reliefs sought in said motion. Clerk of Court added/docketed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Stay. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Tue 07/18 9:59 AM
BRIEF in Support re4 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC.. (Witzel, Kenneth) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss Compel
Tue 07/18 9:56 AM
MOTION to Dismiss or Stay , MOTION to Compel Arbitration by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC.. (Witzel, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Stay
Tue 07/25 3:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Stay by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. (Filed with document4 ) (ksa) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1)
Fri 07/14 10:25 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying Range Resources Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC.. (Witzel, Kenneth) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 07/13 8:34 PM
ORDER that since this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge no later than August 3, 2017. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a Magistrate Judge, Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 07/13/2017. (jmb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Form | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (for Clerk of Court personnel only)
Thu 07/13 5:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greene County, case number AD 439 of 2017 Copies attached: State Court Complaint and Docket Entries, Affidavit of Brian C. Root and Affidavit of Sarah Black (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4394790), filed by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. (ksa) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B State Court Docket Entries, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C Affidavit of Brian C. Root, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D Affidavit of Sarah Black | ||
misc
QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/13 5:20 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney Witzel advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 7/20/2017. (ksa) |