AA Florida Bridal Retail Company, LLC
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mindy A Mora |
Case #: | 9:17-bk-18864 |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Aug 28, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Nov 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 07, 2022 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Oct 16, 2017 |
Debtor
AA Florida Bridal Retail Company, LLC
1625 S Congress Ave Ste 400
Delray Beach, FL 33445-6304 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Robert C Furr
www.furrtrustee.com 2255 Glades Road Ste 337W
Boca Raton, FL 33431 |
|
Trustee
Margaret J. Smith
1400 Centrepark Blvd., Suite 860
West Palm Beach, FL 33401 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 07/15/2017 12:05 AM EDT |
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 07/14 5:01 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-18864 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 30217999. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]
Fri 07/14 3:07 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $335] |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Fri 07/14 3:10 PM
***Replaced by docket entry #4 .*** Meeting of Creditors to be held on 08/16/2017 at 10:00 AM at 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 870, West Palm Beach. Modified on 7/14/2017 - edited text (Cradic, Cameron) |
|
3 | 3
notice
UST Notice Appointing Successor Trustee
Fri 07/14 3:37 PM
Notice Appointing Margaret J. Smith as Chapter 7 Successor Trustee. Robert C Furr Removed from the Case. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 8/28/2017 at 01:00 PM at 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 870, West Palm Beach. (^UST11, DV) |
|
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset)
Fri 07/14 3:41 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 8/28/2017 at 01:00 PM at 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 870, West Palm Beach. Proofs of Claim due by 11/27/2017. (Cradic, Cameron) |