Gegham Margaryan v. Dr. Pepper Snapple Group, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-05234 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 10, 2018 12:57 AM PST |
Defendant
Dr. Pepper Snapple Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Gegham Margaryan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Tue 08/08 9:47 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Northern District, 5:17-cv-04471 filed 8/4/2017. (yl) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Transferring Case
Thu 08/03 3:36 PM
ORDER GRANTING Stipulated Request for Transfer to the Northern District Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(A)15 by Judge John F. Walter that The instant suit be transferred to the Northern District of California, San Jose Division, for the convenience of the parties and witnesses, and in the interests of justice, pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a). Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Transfer Case
Wed 08/02 8:42 AM
STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Jose Division filed by Defendant Dr. Pepper Snapple Group, Inc..(Attorney Jonathan A Shapiro added to party Dr. Pepper Snapple Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Shapiro, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Declaration
Thu 07/27 4:17 PM
DECLARATION of Hovanes Margaryan , Lead Trial Counsel, Re: Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Gegham Margaryan. (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/27 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Standing Order filed by plaintiff Gegham Margaryan. (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order
Thu 07/27 3:05 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. (cw) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)
Thu 07/20 4:22 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-05234 JFW(PLAx). (rn) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 07/20 10:46 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gegham Margaryan, upon Defendant Dr. Pepper Snapple Group, Inc. served on 7/19/2017, answer due 8/9/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, in the care of Daisy Montenegro in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/18 12:19 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Dr. Pepper Snapple Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (shb) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Summons Request
Mon 07/17 4:52 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Gegham Margaryan. (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Mon 07/17 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request5 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 07/17 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Fri 07/14 5:24 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Gegham Margaryan. (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Related Case(s)
Fri 07/14 5:22 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Gegham Margaryan. Related Case(s): 5:17-cv-00564-NC (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 07/14 5:21 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gegham Margaryan, (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 07/14 5:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gegham Margaryan. (Margarian, Hovanes) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 07/14 5:16 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20185915 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Gegham Margaryan. (Attorney Hovanes Margarian added to party Gegham Margaryan(pty:pla))(Margarian, Hovanes) |