Watson v. Colvin
Original Case: 3:15-cv-00527
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02156 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday May 11, 2018 5:06 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Carolyn W. Colvin, Commissioner Of Social Security
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Andre Watson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/11/2018 5:00 AM EDT |
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Andre Watson, FILED. [2077370] 17-2156 [Entered: 07/12/2017 04:49 PM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/15/2017, RECEIVED.[2077376] 17-2156 [Entered: 07/12/2017 04:51 PM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2077379] 17-2156 [Entered: 07/12/2017 04:51 PM] |