Cain v. Mandl College of Allied Health
Original Case: 1:14-cv-01729
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02153 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 14, 2017 3:31 AM EST |
Defendant
Mandl School Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Aisha Reid
|
|
Defendant
Mandel School College of Allied Health
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mel Weiner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Stew Weiner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mandl College, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ileen Cain
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/14/2017 3:27 AM EST |
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ileen Cain, FILED. [2077195] 17-2153 [Entered: 07/12/2017 03:43 PM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 06/22/2017, RECEIVED.[2077202] 17-2153 [Entered: 07/12/2017 03:46 PM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/23/2017, RECEIVED.[2077204] 17-2153 [Entered: 07/12/2017 03:47 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2077206] 17-2153 [Entered: 07/12/2017 03:47 PM] | |
6 | 6 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Ileen Cain, FILED. No service.[2077216] 17-2153 [Entered: 07/12/2017 03:50 PM] |