Ferguson v. Commissioner of Tax and Financ
Original Case: 6:16-cv-06447
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02163 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 27, 2018 4:35 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Commissioner of Tax and Finance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jeremiah M. Ferguson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/27/2018 4:32 AM EDT |
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jeremiah M. Ferguson, FILED. [2078227] 17-2163 [Entered: 07/13/2017 01:52 PM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/12/2017, RECEIVED.[2078230] 17-2163 [Entered: 07/13/2017 01:54 PM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2078233] 17-2163 [Entered: 07/13/2017 01:54 PM] | |
5 | 5 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Jeremiah M. Ferguson, FILED. No service.[2078237] 17-2163 [Entered: 07/13/2017 01:57 PM] |