Bernard v. Lombardo
Original Case: 1:16-cv-00863
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02158 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 4:25 AM EDT |
Appellant
Clearette Cigarette Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Appellant
L.J. Leonard & Sons Inc., DBA Dynamic Creations
|
Represented By
|
Appellant
Lauren Bloodgood
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The LVG Holding Company D&L #1200 LLC
|
|
Defendant
The LeonardVincent Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Brian A. Hudlin
|
|
Defendant
Daniel Gambino
|
|
Defendant
Louis M. Lombardi
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Leonard Vincent Lombardo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
William N. Bernard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
William N. Bernard and Catherine H. Bernard Revocable Living Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/12/2017 6:03 AM EDT |
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Clearette Cigarette Company LLC, FILED. [2077731] 17-2158 [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:12 AM] | |
2 | 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Clearette Cigarette Company LLC, district court receipt # 0208-13884978, FILED.[2077737] 17-2158 [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:15 AM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 06/21/2017, RECEIVED.[2077742] 17-2158 [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:17 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2077746] 17-2158 [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:18 AM] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Leonard Vincent Lombardo, FILED. [2077828] 17-2160 [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:55 AM] | |
6 | 6 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Leonard Vincent Lombardo, district court receipt # 0208-13885055, FILED.[2077850] 17-2160 [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:58 AM] | |
7 | 7 DISTRICT COURT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT LEONARD VINCENT LOMBARDO, dated 12/06/2016, RECEIVED.[2077855] 17-2160 [Entered: 07/13/2017 11:00 AM] | |
8 | 8 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2077859] 17-2160 [Entered: 07/13/2017 11:01 AM] | |
10 | 10 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant L.J. Leonard & Sons Inc., FILED. [2077928] 17-2161 [Entered: 07/13/2017 11:23 AM] | |
11 | 11 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant L.J. Leonard & Sons Inc., district court receipt # 0208-13885067, FILED.[2077935] 17-2161 [Entered: 07/13/2017 11:25 AM] | |
12 | 12 DISTRICT COURT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST L.J. LEONARD & SONS INC. D/B/A/ DYNAMIC CREATIONS, dated 06/21/2017, RECEIVED.[2077944] 17-2161 [Entered: 07/13/2017 11:27 AM] | |
13 | 13 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2077949] 17-2161 [Entered: 07/13/2017 11:28 AM] | |
15 | 15 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Lauren Bloodgood, FILED. [2078202] 17-2162 [Entered: 07/13/2017 01:39 PM] | |
16 | 16 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Lauren Bloodgood, district court receipt # 0208-13887678, FILED.[2078210] 17-2162 [Entered: 07/13/2017 01:43 PM] | |
17 | 17 DISTRICT COURT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST LAURYN BLOODGOOD AKA LAURYN LOMBARDO, dated 06/21/2017, RECEIVED.[2078218] 17-2162 [Entered: 07/13/2017 01:47 PM] | |
18 | 18 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2078221] 17-2162 [Entered: 07/13/2017 01:48 PM] |