Bernard v. Lombardo
Original Case: 1:16-cv-00863
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02160 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
The LVG Holding Company D&L #1200 LLC
|
|
Defendant
The LeonardVincent Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Brian A. Hudlin
|
|
Defendant
Daniel Gambino
|
|
Defendant
Louis M. Lombardi
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Leonard Vincent Lombardo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
William N. Bernard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
William N. Bernard and Catherine H. Bernard Revocable Living Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2017 4:33 AM EDT |
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Leonard Vincent Lombardo, FILED. [2077828] 17-2160 [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:55 AM] | |
2 | 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Leonard Vincent Lombardo, district court receipt # 0208-13885055, FILED.[2077850] 17-2160 [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:58 AM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT LEONARD VINCENT LOMBARDO, dated 12/06/2016, RECEIVED.[2077855] 17-2160 [Entered: 07/13/2017 11:00 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2077859] 17-2160 [Entered: 07/13/2017 11:01 AM] |