Bernard v. Lombardo
Original Case: 1:16-cv-00863
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02162 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 4:26 AM EDT |
Appellant
Lauren Bloodgood
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The LVG Holding Company D&L #1200 LLC
|
|
Defendant
The LeonardVincent Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Brian A. Hudlin
|
|
Defendant
Daniel Gambino
|
|
Defendant
Louis M. Lombardi
|
|
Defendant
Leonard Vincent Lombardo
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
William N. Bernard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
William N. Bernard and Catherine H. Bernard Revocable Living Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/12/2017 6:03 AM EDT |
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Lauren Bloodgood, FILED. [2078202] 17-2162 [Entered: 07/13/2017 01:39 PM] | |
2 | 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Lauren Bloodgood, district court receipt # 0208-13887678, FILED.[2078210] 17-2162 [Entered: 07/13/2017 01:43 PM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST LAURYN BLOODGOOD AKA LAURYN LOMBARDO, dated 06/21/2017, RECEIVED.[2078218] 17-2162 [Entered: 07/13/2017 01:47 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2078221] 17-2162 [Entered: 07/13/2017 01:48 PM] |