Reid v. United Brotherhood of Teamster
Original Case: 1:16-cv-08021
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02143 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2017 4:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
Christopher Sabatino
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Mark A. Reid
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/17/2017 4:33 AM EDT |
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Mark A. Reid, FILED. [2077020] 17-2143 [Entered: 07/12/2017 02:19 PM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/16/2017, RECEIVED.[2077024] 17-2143 [Entered: 07/12/2017 02:21 PM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/16/2017, RECEIVED.[2077026] 17-2143 [Entered: 07/12/2017 02:21 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2077027] 17-2143 [Entered: 07/12/2017 02:22 PM] |