Maximus III Properties, LLC v. Autoparkit, LLC
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Benita Y Pearson |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01495 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 13, 2018 4:00 AM EST |
Defendant
Autoparkit, LLC
6023 Hazeltine Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 91401 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maximus III Properties, LLC
2016 Isabella Court
Girard, OH 44420 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Mon 09/11 1:53 PM
Judgment Entry For the reasons set forth herein, further proceedings in the within cause are hereby perpetually stayed and the within case is hereby closed, subject to reopening upon written motion of Plaintiff or any other proper party in interest, after the granting of relief from the stay imposed by Section 362 or any injunction imposed by virtue of 11 U.S.C. § 524. The Telephonic Case Management Conference set on 9/29/2017 is cancelled. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/11/2017. (JLG) |
|
Sunday, September 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Filing Bankruptcy
Sun 09/10 11:24 AM
Notice of Filing Bankruptcy filed by Maximus III Properties, LLC.(Partlow, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Petition | ||
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
Wed 08/23 10:15 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 9/29/2017 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/23/2017. (JLG) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment No. 1, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment No. 2, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment No. 3, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment No. 4, | ||
Att: 5 Attachment No. 5 | ||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/15 4:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Autoparkit, LLC. (Monroe, John) |
|
oth_evt
Notice of Failure to File Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/15 2:46 PM
Notice by Clerk that Autoparkit, LLC failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (H,SN) |
||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
oth_ans
Response/Reply/Sur-Reply
Mon 08/14 4:30 PM
Jurisdictional Statement of Defendant filed by Autoparkit, LLC. (Monroe, John) |
|
6 | 6
5
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/14 4:21 PM
Defendant Autoparkit LLC's Answer to Complaint filed by Autoparkit, LLC. (Monroe, John) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Thu 07/27 2:31 PM
Order on or before August 14, 2017, Defendant shall file and serve a Jurisdictional Statement identifying the citizenship of all members of Autoparkit, LLC . Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/27/2017(C,KA) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Thu 07/27 2:32 PM
Copy mailed to Autoparkit, LLC, 6023 Hazeltine, Ave., Los Angeles, California 91401. Related document(s)5 . (C,KA) |
||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Return of Service Executed
Wed 07/26 1:29 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by USPS Overnight Express executed upon Autoparkit, LLC on 7/24/2017, filed on behalf of Maximus III Properties, LLC Related document(s)3 . (Partlow, Michael) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Mon 07/17 1:58 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Autoparkit, LLC. (S,L) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
2 | 2
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/17 1:25 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Maximus III Properties, LLC. (Partlow, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/17 1:21 PM
Complaint against Autoparkit, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8242462.. Filed by Maximus III Properties, LLC. (Partlow, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Lease, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Purchase Agreement, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Amended Lease, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Amended Purchase Agreement | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Mon 07/17 1:52 PM
Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (S,L) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/17 1:53 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (S,L) |