Nunez v. City of New York
Original Case: 1:14-cv-04182
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02180 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 11, 2018 4:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
Richard and/or Rachel Roes Nos. 1, 2, 3, etc., (Whose identities are unknown but who are known to be supervisory personnel of the New York City Police Department), all of whom are sued individually and in their official capacities
|
|
Defendant
John and/or Jane Does Nos. 1, 2, 3, etc., (Whose identities are unknown but who are known to be police officers of the New York City Police Department), all of whom are sued individually and in their official capacities
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
District Attorney Robert Johnson, Bronx County in his official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Assistant District Attorney Cleopatra Takantzas, in her individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Lieutenant John Rogan, Shield #902945 in their individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Detective Steve Alejandro, Shield #912873 in their individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Detective Rene Narvaez, Shield #900942 in their individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Detective Cliff Acosta, Shield #982718 in their individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Detective Damian Diedrick, Shield #923769 in their individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Assistant District Attorney Cleopatra Takantzas, in her individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Lieutenant John Rogan, Shield #902945 in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Detective Steve Alejandro, Shield #912873 in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Detective Rene Narvaez, Shield #900942 in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Detective Cliff Acosta, Shield #982718 in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Detective Damian Diedrick, Shield #923769 in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
City of New York, a municipal entity
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Francisco Nunez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/11/2018 4:30 AM EDT |
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Francisco Nunez, FILED. [2079377] 17-2180 [Entered: 07/14/2017 03:17 PM] | |
2 | 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Francisco Nunez, district court receipt # 020813890706, FILED.[2079380] 17-2180 [Entered: 07/14/2017 03:20 PM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/21/2017, RECEIVED.[2079384] 17-2180 [Entered: 07/14/2017 03:21 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2079385] 17-2180 [Entered: 07/14/2017 03:22 PM] |