Ritter v. Town & City of Board of Electi, et al
Original Case: 1:16-cv-09594
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02183 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 18, 2017 4:25 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Gary Partlow
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mayor, Mount Vernon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Town & City of Board of Elections
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Andrew Wallace
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gniffer
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Roberta Spazzo
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Yuhanna Edwards
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Council Board Members
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Senator Jamaal Bailey
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ruth Thompson
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Engel Ingel
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Immigration Reform Bill
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Lyndon Williams, Legislator
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
City of New York Officers in the Town of Mount Vernon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Reginald Lafayette
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Maureen Walker, Comptroller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ernie Davis, Prior Mayor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Richard Thomas, Present Mayor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Stephan D. Ritter, We the People the Public of Westchester County & Mount Vernon Housing Authority of the State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/18/2017 4:21 AM EDT |
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Stephan D. Ritter, FILED. [2079478] 17-2183 [Entered: 07/14/2017 03:59 PM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 01/25/2017, RECEIVED.[2079480] 17-2183 [Entered: 07/14/2017 04:02 PM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/25/2017, RECEIVED.[2079481] 17-2183 [Entered: 07/14/2017 04:03 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2079483] 17-2183 [Entered: 07/14/2017 04:03 PM] | |
5 | 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2079488] 17-2183 [Entered: 07/14/2017 04:04 PM] |