Adejare v. St. Charles Hospital & Rehabil
Original Case: 2:16-cv-00805
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02175 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 23, 2017 3:39 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
St. Charles Hospital Catholic Health Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Maureen Morris
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nancy Ladika
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
St. Charles Hospital & Rehabilitation Center
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Oluwabunmi Adejare
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/23/2017 3:30 AM EST |
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Oluwabunmi Adejare, FILED. [2079136] 17-2175 [Entered: 07/14/2017 01:12 PM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 06/13/2017, RECEIVED.[2079142] 17-2175 [Entered: 07/14/2017 01:15 PM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/13/2017, RECEIVED.[2079143] 17-2175 [Entered: 07/14/2017 01:16 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2079151] 17-2175 [Entered: 07/14/2017 01:19 PM] |