NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. et al v. Trump et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew L Carter, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-05427 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2201dj Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 14, 2018 4:40 AM EST |
Defendant
Kris W. Kobach
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael R. Pence
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Donald J. Trump
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Ordinary People Society
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
#HealSTL
#HealSTL 4028 W. Florissant
St. Louis, MO 63115 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hispanic Federation
Hispanic Federation 55 Exchange Place, 5th Floor
New York, NY 10005 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Labor Council For Latin American Advancement
|
Represented By
Julia Alejandra Gomez Hernandez
Maldef (mexican American Legal Defense And Educational Fund) contact info |
Plaintiff
Mi Familia Vota
|
Represented By
Julia Alejandra Gomez Hernandez
Maldef (mexican American Legal Defense And Educational Fund) contact info |
Plaintiff
National Association For The Advancement Of Colored People Florida State Conference
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
National Association For The Advancement Of Colored People Pennsylvania State Conference
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Southwest Voter Registration Education Project
|
Represented By
Julia Alejandra Gomez Hernandez
Maldef (mexican American Legal Defense And Educational Fund) contact info |
1. | NAACP files lawsuit against Trump's voter commission alleging racially discriminatory intent (washingtonpost.com) |
Submitted Wed 07/19/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
94 | 94
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 02/28 3:32 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.; The Ordinary People Society; #HealSTL; National Association for the Advancement of Colored People Pennsylvania State Conference; National Association for the Advancement of Colored People Florida State Conference; Hispanic Federation; Mi Familia Vota; Southwest Voter Registration Education Project; and Labor Council for Latin American Advancement's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of the above-captioned action, without prejudice, against the Defendants Donald J. Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States; Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity, an advisory committee formerly commissioned by President Trump; Michael R. Pence, in his former official capacity as Chair of the Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity; and Kris W. Kobach, in his former official capacity as Vice Chair of the Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity. Plaintiffs' Motion is hereby GRANTED. All parties shall bear their own costs and expenses incurred in the above-captioned action. Motions terminated:93 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Unopposed, filed by The Ordinary People Society, #HealSTL, Mi Familia Vota, NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., National Association For The Advancement Of Colored People Pennsylvania State Conference, Hispanic Federation, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Labor Council For Latin American Advancement, National Association For The Advancement Of Colored People Florida State Conference,78 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Michael R. Pence, Kris W. Kobach, Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity, Donald J. Trump. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/28/2018) (ap) |
|
93 | 93
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 02/28 10:58 AM
MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Unopposed . Document filed by #HealSTL, Hispanic Federation, Labor Council For Latin American Advancement, Mi Familia Vota, NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., National Association For The Advancement Of Colored People Florida State Conference, National Association For The Advancement Of Colored People Pennsylvania State Conference, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, The Ordinary People Society.(Merle, Natasha) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
92 | 92
misc
Letter
Wed 02/28 10:47 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Joseph E. Borson dated Feb. 28, 2018 re: Status of Activities Related to the Termination of the Former Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity. Document filed by Kris W. Kobach, Michael R. Pence, Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity, Donald J. Trump.(Borson, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Wed 02/28 3:35 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines. (ap) |