Negron v. Bank of America Corporation, et al
Original Case: 1:15-cv-08296
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02192 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2019 4:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Steve Curtis
|
|
Defendant
Jeff Lovvorn
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America Merrill Lynch
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Banc of America Securities, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nick Pinarligil
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
James Holloway
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Thomas Holz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Larry Negron
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/11/2019 4:24 AM EDT |
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Larry Negron, FILED. [2080108] 17-2192 [Entered: 07/17/2017 01:02 PM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/16/2017, RECEIVED.[2080115] 17-2192 [Entered: 07/17/2017 01:05 PM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/28/2017, RECEIVED.[2080116] 17-2192 [Entered: 07/17/2017 01:05 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2080117] 17-2192 [Entered: 07/17/2017 01:06 PM] |