11
|
|
11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (Order Dismissing)
Sat 08/05 12:45 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Order Dismissing) Related [+]. Notice Date 08/04/2017. (Admin.)
|
10
|
|
10
order
Dismissing Case/Party
Wed 08/02 12:04 PM
Order Dismissing Ch. 11 Case for failure to pay filing fee Related [+]. (Gambini, Christopher)
|
9
|
|
9
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Hearing)
Fri 07/28 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Hearing) Related [+]. Notice Date 07/27/2017. (Admin.)
|
8
|
|
8
court
Hearing
Tue 07/25 2:24 PM
Notice setting objection date and hearing. Request submitted to BNC for mailing. Related [+]. Objections due by 8/15/2017. Hearing scheduled for 8/25/2017 at 10:00 AM at 240 West Third Street, US Courthouse, Third Floor, Courtroom #3, Williamsport, PA 17701. (Davis, Karen)
|
7
|
|
7
motion
Dismiss Case/Party and/or Convert Ch 11 to Ch 7 (11 USC 1112(a) OR 1112(b))
Mon 07/24 2:11 PM
Motion to Dismiss Ch. 11 Case . Filed by D. Troy Sellars of Office of the United States Trustee on behalf of United States Trustee Related [+]. (Sellars, D.)
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Order
|
| |
Att: 2
Certificate of Service
|
6
|
|
6
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (Ch 11 document sent to the Securities and Exchange Commission)
Sat 07/22 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Ch 11 document sent to the Securities and Exchange Commission) Related [+]. Notice Date 07/21/2017. (Admin.)
|
5
|
|
5
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (Order regarding filing fee due)
Sat 07/22 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Order regarding filing fee due) Related [+]. Notice Date 07/21/2017. (Admin.)
|
4
|
|
4
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Deficient Filing (Missing Documents))
Sat 07/22 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Deficient Filing (Missing Documents)) Related [+]. Notice Date 07/21/2017. (Admin.)
|
3
|
|
3
court
Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing (f/k/a Missing documents)
Wed 07/19 1:51 PM
Notice of Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing. Request submitted to BNC for mailing. Related [+]. (Radginski, Pamela)
|
2
|
|
2
order
Filing Fee Due
Wed 07/19 1:49 PM
Order filing fee due in the amount of $ 1717.00 for Bankruptcy Petition Related [+]. Amount due on: 7/28/2017. (Radginski, Pamela)
|
1
|
|
1
5
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) opened by Court user
Wed 07/19 1:48 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual . Filing fee due in the amount of $1717.00. Filed by 243 S. Main LLC . (Radginski, Pamela)
Related: [-]
|