Lesnik v.Eisenmann SE et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Referred: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:16-cv-01120 |
Nature of Suit | 375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act |
Cause | 31:3729 False Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Oct 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 21, 2017 1:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
ISM Vuzem USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ivan Vuzem
|
|
Defendant
Volkswagen
|
|
Defendant
Eisenmann Alagenbau Verwaltung GmbH
|
|
Defendant
Robert Vuzem
|
|
Defendant
Telsa Motors, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mercedes-Benz U.S. International, Inc.,
|
|
Defendant
Vuzem USA, Inc.,
|
|
Defendant
ISM Vuzem d.o.o.
|
|
Defendant
Gregurec Ltd,
|
|
Defendant
Eisenmann Alagenbau GmbH & Co. KG
|
|
Defendant
Eisenmann SE
|
|
Defendant
Eisenmann Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Daimler AG,
|
|
Defendant
CiTic Dicastal Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Bayerische Motoren Werke
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregor Lesnik
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal judge rules Tesla must defend itself against lawsuit alleging it mistreated foreign workers (social.techcrunch.com) |
Submitted Wed 10/03/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
630 | 630
utility
Remark
Fri 03/01 12:04 PM
Clerks Certification of Finality of Judgment issued. (slh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
629 | 629
1
pgs
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Tue 02/27 4:35 PM
ORDER GRANTING 628 PLAINTIFF STJEPAN PAPES ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF CERTIFICATE BY THE COURT OF THE FINALITY OF THE THREE PAGE FIRST AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT ISSUED JANUARY 10, 2024. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/27/2024. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
628 | 628
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Thu 02/22 1:09 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to issue Certificate of Finality of Judgment in favor of Papes filed by Stjepan Papes. Responses due by 2/26/2024.(Dresser, William) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Decl of Counsel ISO Admin Mtn, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order |