Kramer v. Shulkin
Original Case: 1:16-cv-06174
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02199 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 08, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 12, 2018 4:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
Secretary Robert A. McDonald, Of the United States Department of Veterans Affairs
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Officer Steven Figueroa, Law Enforcement Officer of The United States Department of Veterans Affairs
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Moreno, Law Enforcement officer of the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Dr. Lulla
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nurse Aponte
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nurse King
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Erik Langhoff, James J. Peters VA Medical Center
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Secretary David J. Shulkin, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
James J. Peters VA Medical Center
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Hyman Kramer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/12/2018 4:31 AM EDT |
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Hyman Kramer, FILED. [2080805] 17-2199 [Entered: 07/18/2017 11:22 AM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/22/2017, RECEIVED.[2080826] 17-2199 [Entered: 07/18/2017 11:32 AM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Hyman Kramer, district court receipt # 465401185559, FILED.[2080829] 17-2199 [Entered: 07/18/2017 11:33 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2080832] 17-2199 [Entered: 07/18/2017 11:33 AM] |