Chambliss v. Westchester County Department
Original Case: 1:17-cv-03019
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02221 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 14, 2017 3:29 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Westchester County Department of Social Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Marven Laborde
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Komalathu Kurien
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bugenio Diaz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
George Babu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Sheila Harris Chambliss
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/14/2017 3:24 AM EST |
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Sheila Harris Chambliss, copy to Pro Se, FILED. [2082616] 17-2221 [Entered: 07/20/2017 09:50 AM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 06/12/2017, RECEIVED.[2082635] 17-2221 [Entered: 07/20/2017 09:57 AM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT CIVIL JUDGMENT, dated 06/12/2017, RECEIVED.[2082640] 17-2221 [Entered: 07/20/2017 10:02 AM] | |
4 | 4 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Sheila Harris Chambliss, FILED. [2082646] 17-2221 [Entered: 07/20/2017 10:07 AM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, copy to Pro Se, FILED.[2082652] 17-2221 [Entered: 07/20/2017 10:09 AM] |