Clark v. Iocco
Original Case: 1:13-cv-00210
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02207 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 30, 2017 4:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
City of New York
|
|
Defendant
New York City Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Best Western Hotels
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Police Officer Iocco
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Police Officer Del Villar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Wilma Clark
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/30/2017 4:30 AM EDT |
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Wilma Clark, FILED. [2081168] 17-2207 [Entered: 07/18/2017 02:42 PM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/07/2017, RECEIVED.[2081186] 17-2207 [Entered: 07/18/2017 02:48 PM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/08/2017, RECEIVED.[2081188] 17-2207 [Entered: 07/18/2017 02:48 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2081197] 17-2207 [Entered: 07/18/2017 02:54 PM] | |
6 | 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2081212] 17-2207 [Entered: 07/18/2017 03:00 PM] |