Brennan v. Broome County
Original Case: 3:17-cv-00122
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02210 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 09, 2017 3:32 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Broome County
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Robert George Behnke, III, FKA Robert Benke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kevin Joseph Gabriel Brennan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/09/2017 3:30 AM EST |
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Kevin Joseph Gabriel Brennan, FILED. [2081706] 17-2210 [Entered: 07/19/2017 10:04 AM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION and ORDER, dated 07/05/2017, RECEIVED.[2081713] 17-2210 [Entered: 07/19/2017 10:07 AM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2081714] 17-2210 [Entered: 07/19/2017 10:07 AM] |