King v. Wang
Original Case: 1:14-cv-07694
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02220 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 26, 2017 4:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Does, 1-9
|
|
Defendant
Yue Da-Jin
|
|
Defendant
Ye Yong-Qing
|
|
Defendant
Wei Zheng
|
|
Defendant
Chen Mei-Lin
|
|
Defendant
Anthony Chou
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Wei Zheng
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Does, 1-9
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Yue Da-Jin
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ye Yong-Qing
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Chen Mei-Lin
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Anthony Chou
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jian Bao Gallery
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bao Wu Tang
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Shou-Kung Wang
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Andrew Wang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth King
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kenneth King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Northwich Investments, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Soon Huat, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Yien-Koo King
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/26/2017 4:27 AM EDT |
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Kenneth King, Yien-Koo King, Northwich Investments, Ltd. and Soon Huat, Inc., FILED. [2082192] 17-2220 [Entered: 07/19/2017 02:49 PM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION & ORDER, dated 06/20/2017, RECEIVED.[2082197] 17-2220 [Entered: 07/19/2017 02:51 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Kenneth King, Yien-Koo King, Northwich Investments, Ltd. and Soon Huat, Inc., district court receipt # 0208-13914167, FILED.[2082199] 17-2220 [Entered: 07/19/2017 02:51 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2082203] 17-2220 [Entered: 07/19/2017 02:52 PM] |