Kim v. Arias
Original Case: 1:17-cv-02540
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02216 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 26, 2017 4:43 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Jose Arias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Tan Kim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jae Soog Lee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/26/2017 4:37 AM EDT |
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Tan Kim and Jae Soog Lee, FILED. [2082104] 17-2216 [Entered: 07/19/2017 01:43 PM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/11/2017, RECEIVED.[2082110] 17-2216 [Entered: 07/19/2017 01:53 PM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 07/12/2017, RECEIVED.[2082112] 17-2216 [Entered: 07/19/2017 01:54 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2082113] 17-2216 [Entered: 07/19/2017 01:55 PM] | |
5 | 5 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Jae Soog Lee for Appellant Jae Soog Lee and Tan Kim and Scott R. Dinstell for Appellee Jose Arias, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2082269] 17-2216 [Entered: 07/19/2017 03:23 PM] |