Herrera v. Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc. et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Bruce J Mcgiverin |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01993 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1346 Tort Claim |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 17, 2018 5:03 AM AST |
Defendant
Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc.
San Geronimo Building Los Rosales Street Puerta de Tierra
San Juan, PR 00906 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insurance Company ABC 1 to Insurance Company XYZ 50
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 1 to 50
|
|
Plaintiff
Mandy Herrera
1881 Cornelia Street Apt. 1L
Ridgewood, NY 11385 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, June 10, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
order
Judgment
Mon 06/10 12:49 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 6/10/2019. (jm) |
|
33 | 33
order
Order
Mon 06/10 12:08 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice : This case is dismissed with prejudice and without imposition of costs or fees. The court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the parties' settlement agreement. Final judgment to be entered. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 6/10/2019. (jm) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Stipulation
Mon 06/10 11:26 AM
STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Mandy Herrera. (Gierbolini-Gonzalez, Fernando) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation
Fri 06/07 11:51 AM
STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Mandy Herrera. (Gierbolini-Gonzalez, Fernando) |
|
misc
Notice of Docket Text Modification
Mon 06/10 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re:31 Stipulation. ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** (mcm) |
||
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 05/31 11:45 AM
ORDER granting29 Motion for extension of time: Joint stipulation for voluntary dismissal is due by 6/7/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 5/31/2019. (jm) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 05/30 3:00 PM
MOTION for extension of time filed by Fernando J. Gierbolini-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gierbolini-Gonzalez, Fernando) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Informative Motion
Fri 05/17 11:50 AM
ORDER granting27 INFORMATIVE motion. Today's pretrial/settlement conference is VACATED. The parties shall file a joint stipulation for voluntary dismissal by May 28, 2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on May 17, 2019. (McGiverin, Bruce) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Informative Motion
Fri 05/17 11:38 AM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding for Continuance filed by Alexandra Sanchez-Mitchell on behalf of Mandy Herrera Responses due by 5/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Mitchell, Alexandra) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 04/15 6:27 PM
ORDER finding as moot25 Motion for extension of time. The requested extension has expired. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on April 15, 2019. (McGiverin, Bruce) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 03/07 1:43 PM
Joint MOTION for extension of time filed by Alexandra Sanchez-Mitchell on behalf of Mandy Herrera Responses due by 3/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Mitchell, Alexandra) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 02/07 10:08 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion for extension of time,23 Motion for extension of time: Deadline for all parties to conclude discovery extended to 3/15/2019. Deadline for dispositive motions extended to 5/3/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 2/7/2019. (jm) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 01/31 5:19 PM
MOTION for extension of time filed by Alexandra Sanchez-Mitchell on behalf of Mandy Herrera Responses due by 2/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Mitchell, Alexandra) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 01/31 4:18 PM
MOTION for extension of time until March 15, 2019 to limited discovery filed by Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua on behalf of Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 2/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Marmol-Lantigua, Hector) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 11/05 4:35 PM
ORDER granting as requested20 Joint Motion for extension of time: Discovery deadline extended to 1/31/2019. Dispositive motions to be filed by 3/31/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 11/5/2018. (jm) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 10/31 10:36 AM
Joint MOTION for extension of time until January 31, 2019 to Discovery Deadline filed by Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua on behalf of Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 11/14/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marmol-Lantigua, Hector) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/07 12:46 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery to conclude by 11/5/2018. Dispositive motions to be filed by 1/31/2019. Joint proposed pretrial order to be filed by 5/6/2019. Final pretrial/settlement conference is set for 5/17/2019 at 3:00 PM in BJM's Chambers. Jury selection/trial to begin 6/3/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 9. The court urges the parties to explore early settlement. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 8/7/2018. (jm) |
|
18 | 18
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Tue 08/07 11:07 AM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order entered by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 08/06/2018 (Docket No. 17), and the parties' consent15 , this case has been randomly assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for trial management and disposition. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 17-1993 (BJM). Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 08/07/2018. (ft) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 08/06 5:54 PM
ORDER re15 Initial Scheduling Memorandum filed by Mandy Herrera. The parties' consent to the trial jurisdiction of a magistrate judge is Noted. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is to randomly assigned this case to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for trial management and disposition. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/6/2018.(wm) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 05/10 1:18 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Clerk is to update docket accordingly. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 5/10/2018. (wm) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Initial Scheduling Conference Memorandum
Tue 04/10 4:26 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM by Mandy Herrera. (Sanchez-Mitchell, Alexandra) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Withdraw Attorney
Mon 04/02 8:36 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Rafael E. Diaz-Gonzalez filed by Rafael E. Diaz-Gonzalez on behalf of Mandy Herrera Responses due by 4/16/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Gonzalez, Rafael) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/26 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Sanchez-Mitchell on behalf of Mandy Herrera (Sanchez-Mitchell, Alexandra) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 09/01 11:43 AM
ORDER. Parties are to submit a Joint Proposed Initial Scheduling Memorandum, which must include the parties theories of the case. Memorandum Filing due by 10/2/2017. . In addition, the parties are granted until O10/2/2017, to state whether they consent to the trial jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/1/2017.(wm) (ov) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Appear
Fri 09/01 11:37 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/1/2017. (wm) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 09/01 11:36 AM
ORDER re7 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 25, 2017 to File Answer , MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc. GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/1/2017.(wm) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/28 8:35 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Defendant Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc..(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear
Thu 08/17 2:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear as additional counsel filed by Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua on behalf of Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 8/31/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marmol-Lantigua, Hector) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer Appear
Thu 08/17 7:50 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time until September 25, 2017 to File Answer re:1 Complaint, filed by Mandy Herrera, MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 8/31/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Appear
Wed 08/02 11:00 AM
ORDER re4 Motion for Leave to Appear. Noted and Granted. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/2/2017. (wm) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/28 12:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mandy Herrera upon Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc. served on 7/27/2017, answer due 8/17/2017. (Diaz-Gonzalez, Rafael) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear
Mon 07/24 2:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Fernando J. Gierbolini-Gonzalez on behalf of Mandy Herrera Responses due by 8/7/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gierbolini-Gonzalez, Fernando) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/24 11:02 AM
Summons Issued as to Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc. (arg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 07/24 9:32 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/21 6:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Hilton International of Puerto Rico, Inc., Insurance Company ABC 1 to Insurance Company XYZ 50, John Doe 1 to 50 ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5541537.), filed by Mandy Herrera. Service due by 10/19/2017,(Diaz-Gonzalez, Rafael) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Change of Address Form |