ERKAL Uluslararasi Nakliyat ve Tic. A. S. v. Transatlantic Lines, LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Corrigan |
Referred: | Joel B Toomey |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00840 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 20, 2018 4:06 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
Transatlantic Lines, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
M/V "Geysir"
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
ERKAL Uluslararasi Nakliyat ve Tic. A. S.
|
Represented By
|
Custodian
National Maritime Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
M/V "Geysir"
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Transatlantic Lines, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Ernesto Nemesio
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Keybank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Vladislav Love
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Peter Machon
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Yousri Maghrabi
2 Sylvan Way
South Yarmouth, MA 02664 |
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Marine Engineers' Beneficial Association
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Louis Moglia
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Alfred Hogan
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Robert Paulsen
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Gary Schlotterer
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Michael Townsend
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Garrets International A/S
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
West Coast Ship Supply
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Calvin Ray Johnson, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Darryl Hawkins
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Golten Service Co., Inc.
Golten Service Co., Inc. 2323 NE Miami Court
Miami, FL 33137 |
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Arturo Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Endofa LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Angelo Crudo
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Richard Combs
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Paul Cojocaru
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Zachery Bradley
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Wilson Blaylock
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Rory Binder
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Thomas Adkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ERKAL Uluslararasi Nakliyat ve Tic. A. S.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
174 | 174
order
Judgment
Thu 09/27 3:12 PM
JUDGMENT that pursuant to this Court's Order entered September 27, 2018, Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff Erkal Uluslararasi Nakliyat Ve Tic. A. S. d/b/a Tuzla Shipyard, and against Defendant Transatlantic Lines, LLC in the amount of $314,300.00. Post-judgment interest shall accrue at the statutory rate set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1961. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 9/27/2018. (JSG) |
|
173 | 173
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Report and Recommendations
Thu 09/27 12:08 PM
ORDER adopting 172 Report and Recommendations; granting 162 Motion for Final Default Judgment against the Defendant, Transatlantic Lines, LLC, in personam and 158 Plaintiff's construed motion to dismiss. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff Erkal Uluslararasi Nakliyat Ve Tic. A. S. d/b/a Tuzla Shipyard, and against Defendant Transatlantic Lines, LLC in the amount of $314,300. Post-judgment interest shall accrue at the statutory rate set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1961. Count I of the Amended Complaint, (Doc. 15), and Defendant's Counterclaim, (Doc. 16), are dismissed. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions and deadlines, and then close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 9/27/2018. (JJB) |