Google LLC. v. Equustek Solutions Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Referred: | Nathanael M Cousins |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-04207 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 20, 2018 1:14 AM PST |
Amicus
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94110 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
Wikimedia Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Angus
|
|
Defendant
Clarma Enterprises Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Equustek Solutions Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
56 | 56
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 12/14 5:19 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/14/2017. The Clerk shall close this file. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017) |
|
55 | 55
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thu 12/14 5:18 PM
ORDER GRANTING 53 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/14/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017) |