Anne Gober et al v. Behr Process Corp et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew J Guilford |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-01282 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 21, 2018 12:40 AM PST |
Defendant
Behr Paint Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Behr Process Corp
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Masco Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Home Depot Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Corneail
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Darby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Durda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anne Gober
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Weygant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Wormwood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Zablotny
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 11/01 9:52 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Statistically Closing Consolidated Cases by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: A Consolidated Class Action Complaint having been filed on October 27, 2017 in lead case SACV 17-1016 AG(KESx), the Court orders that cases SAV 17-1100 AG(KESx), SACV 17-1228 AG(KESx), SACV 17-1282 AG(KESx), SACV 17-1374 AG(KESx) and SACV 17-1488 AG(KESx) be statistically inactivated at this time. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lwag) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 10/23 1:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. IT IS SO ORDERED THAT:1. All deadlines and hearings in the cases are VACATED.2. The following dates, which were entered via the Rule 26 Joint Statement andsubsequent court conference in Richey, shall apply to all of the consolidated cases: (see order) 3. Plaintiffs shall file a single Consolidated Complaint by Friday, October 27, 2017. 4. All parties shall exchange consolidated Initial Disclosures by November 9, 2017. 5. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Complaint by Monday, November 20, 2017. 6. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition by Monday, December 18, 2017. 7. Defendants shall file any reply by Monday, January 15, 2018. (es) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Create Case Association
Fri 10/13 3:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. Cases associated with Lead Case SACV 17-01016 AG (KESx) (twdb) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 10/02 3:37 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance,28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
38 | 38
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 10/02 2:11 PM
ORDER RE EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (lb) |
|
37 | 37
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/02 12:57 PM
ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting29 Non-Resident Attorney Mark S. Mester APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants Behr Process Corporation, Behr Paint Corp. and Masco Corporation, designating Michael Jaeger as local counsel. (dro) |
|
36 | 36
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 10/02 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., The Home Depot Inc., identifying Anne Gober; David Wormwood; Aaron Corneail; Charles Weygant; Deborah Durda; Joel Darby; Bryon Zablotny; Behr Process Corporation; Behr Paint Corp.; Masco Corporation; The Home Depot, Inc.; Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Zipser, Dean) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 10/02 11:45 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., The Home Depot Inc. identifying The Home Depot, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Zipser, Dean) |
|
34 | 34
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Mon 10/02 11:41 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Claims filed by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., The Home Depot Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attorney Dean J Zipser added to party The Home Depot Inc.(pty:dft)) (Zipser, Dean) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 09/29 4:06 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Behr Paint Corp. answer now due 10/20/2017; Behr Process Corp answer now due 10/20/2017; Masco Corp. answer now due 10/20/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendants Behr Paint Corp.; Behr Process Corp; Masco Corp..(Jaeger, Michael) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/29 3:50 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Behr Paint Corp., Behr Process Corp, Masco Corp. (Jaeger, Michael) |
|
31 | 31
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 09/29 12:10 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Behr Paint Corp., Behr Process Corp, Masco Corp., (Jaeger, Michael) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 09/29 12:04 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kathleen P. Lally to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Behr Paint Corp., Behr Process Corp, Masco Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20586685) filed by Defendants Behr Paint Co rp., Behr Process Corp, Masco Corp.. (Jaeger, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
29 | 29
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 09/29 12:00 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark S. Mester to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Behr Paint Corp., Behr Process Corp, Masco Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20586594) filed by Defendants Behr Paint Corp. , Behr Process Corp, Masco Corp.. (Jaeger, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
28 | 28
notice
Appearance
Fri 09/29 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Jaeger on behalf of Defendants Behr Paint Corp., Behr Process Corp, Masco Corp. (Attorney Michael Jaeger added to party Behr Paint Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Jaeger added to party Behr Process Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Jaeger added to party Masco Corp.(pty:dft))(Jaeger, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Tue 09/26 12:35 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-01016-AG (KESx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi to Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:17-cv-01282-AG (KESx). Signed by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (dv) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 09/01 12:43 PM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting24 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey K. Douglass APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants The Home Depot Inc and Home Depot USA Inc, designating Dean J. Zipser as local counsel. (lwag) |
|
25 | 25
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 09/01 12:34 PM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting23 Non-Resident Attorney Robert P. Alpert APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants The Home Depot, Inc and Home Depot USA Inc, designating Dean J. Zipser as local counsel. (lwag) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 08/30 10:20 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey K. Douglass to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20431167) filed by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Zipser, Dean) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
23 | 23
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 08/30 10:17 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert P. Alpert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20431125) filed by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Attorney Dean J Zipser added to party Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.(pty:dft)) (Zipser, Dean) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Thu 08/17 10:51 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Waiver of Service Executed21 , Waiver of Service Executed20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Adobe error message: out of memory. Can not open attachments. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 08/16 8:41 AM
Amended WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joel Darby, Charles Weygant, Brian Zablotny, David Wormwood, Aaron Corneail, Anne Gober, Deborah Durda. Waiver of Service signed by Robert P. Alpert, Esq.. (Shub, Jonathan) |
|
20 | 20
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 08/16 8:20 AM
Amended WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joel Darby, Charles Weygant, Brian Zablotny, David Wormwood, Aaron Corneail, Anne Gober, Deborah Durda. Waiver of Service signed by Robert P. Alpert, Esq.. (Shub, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 08/11 6:56 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joel Darby, Charles Weygant, Brian Zablotny, David Wormwood, Aaron Corneail, Anne Gober, Deborah Durda. upon Masco Corp. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/1/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Kathleen Lally, Esq.. (Shub, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 08/08 11:45 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joel Darby, Charles Weygant, Brian Zablotny, David Wormwood, Aaron Corneail, Anne Gober, Deborah Durda. upon Behr Process Corp waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/1/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Kathleen Lally, Esq.. (Shub, Jonathan) |
|
17 | 17
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 08/08 11:21 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joel Darby, Charles Weygant, Brian Zablotny, David Wormwood, Aaron Corneail, Anne Gober, Deborah Durda. upon Behr Paint Corp. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/1/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Kathleen Lally, Esq.. (Shub, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 08/07 7:39 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joel Darby, Charles Weygant, Brian Zablotny, David Wormwood, Aaron Corneail, Anne Gober, Deborah Durda. upon Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/1/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Robert Alpert, Esq.. (Shub, Jonathan) |
|
15 | 15
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 08/07 7:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joel Darby, Charles Weygant, Brian Zablotny, David Wormwood, Aaron Corneail, Anne Gober, Deborah Durda. upon The Home Depot Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/1/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Robert Alpert, Esq.. (Shub, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 08/01 1:27 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Transfer Pursuant to GO 16-05 DECLINED-(related case)(CV 34)
Mon 07/31 9:53 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, for the reasons set forth on this order. The reasons below are not sufficiently present. Related Case No. SACV17-01016 AG (KESx) (dro) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 07/27 2:10 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to Defendants Behr Paint Corp., Behr Process Corp, Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., Masco Corp., and The Home Depot Inc. (jtil) |
|
Att: 1 Masco, | ||
Att: 2 Home Depot USA, | ||
Att: 3 The Home Depot, | ||
Att: 4 Behr | ||
11 | 11
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 07/27 2:06 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 07/27 2:06 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (jtil) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 07/27 1:59 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Behr Paint Corp., Behr Process Corp, Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., Masco Corp., The Home Depot Inc.. (jtil) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Summons Request
Tue 07/25 7:53 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs Aaron Corneail, Joel Darby, Deborah Durda, Anne Gober, Charles Weygant, David Wormwood, Brian Zablotny. (Shub, Jonathan) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Summons Request
Tue 07/25 7:53 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs Aaron Corneail, Joel Darby, Deborah Durda, Anne Gober, Charles Weygant, David Wormwood, Brian Zablotny. (Shub, Jonathan) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Summons Request
Tue 07/25 7:52 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs Aaron Corneail, Joel Darby, Deborah Durda, Anne Gober, Charles Weygant, David Wormwood, Brian Zablotny. (Shub, Jonathan) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Tue 07/25 7:51 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs Aaron Corneail, Joel Darby, Deborah Durda, Anne Gober, Charles Weygant, David Wormwood, Brian Zablotny. (Shub, Jonathan) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 07/25 7:51 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs Aaron Corneail, Joel Darby, Deborah Durda, Anne Gober, Charles Weygant, David Wormwood, Brian Zablotny. (Shub, Jonathan) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 07/25 7:49 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Shub, Jonathan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 07/25 7:42 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Aaron Corneail, Joel Darby, Deborah Durda, Anne Gober, Charles Weygant, David Wormwood, Brian Zablotny. (Shub, Jonathan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 07/25 7:36 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20232973 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Joel Darby, Charles Weygant, Brian Zablotny, David Wormwood, Aaron Corneail, Anne Gober, Deborah Durda. (Attorney Jonathan Shub added to party Aaron Corneail(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Shub added to party Joel Darby(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Shub added to party Deborah Durda(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Shub added to party Anne Gober(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Shub added to party Charles Weygant(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Shub added to party David Wormwood(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Shub added to party Brian Zablotny(pty:pla))(Shub, Jonathan) |