Martin v. New Mexico Corrections Department et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | M Christina Armijo |
Referred: | Stephan M Vidmar |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00771 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 07, 2018 |
Defendant
Centurion Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
FNU Hernandez
|
|
Defendant
New Mexico Corrections Department
|
|
Plaintiff
James S. Martin
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
39 | 39 Letter by U S District Court remanding case to First Judicial District Court (vv) | |
38 | 38 13 pgs MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER remanding case and denying6 MOTION to Certify, denying33 MOTION to Amend/Correct, denying as moot7 MOTION to Sever, granting and denying in part4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by District Judge M. Christina Armijo. (vv) | |
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
37 | 37 NOTICE of Change of Address by James S. Martin (bap) | |
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
36 | 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FNU Hernandez Defendant Hernandez's First Supplement to Her Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents to Defendant-Hernandez (Cormier, Zachary) | |
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
35 | 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FNU Hernandez Defendant Hernandez's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories to Defendant-Hernandez (Cormier, Zachary) | |
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
34 | 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FNU Hernandez Defendant Hernandez's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents to Defendant-Hernandez (Cormier, Zachary) | |
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
33 | 33 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Address of Record by New Mexico Corrections Department. (Ganz, Paula) | |
32 | 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New Mexico Corrections Department (Ganz, Paula) | |
31 | 31 NOTICE of Change of Address by James S. Martin (vv) | |
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
30 | 30 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Defendant Hernandez's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (Tort) , filed by FNU Hernandez. (Cormier, Zachary) | |
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
29 | 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of request for production by James S. Martin (vv) | |
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
28 | 28 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Centurion Incorporated re4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Centurion Incorporated (White, Geoffrey) | |
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
27 | 27 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document5 Motion to Dismiss by FNU Hernandez (Cormier, Zachary) | |
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
26 | 26 NMCD's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by New Mexico Corrections Department. (Ganz, Paula) | |
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
25 | 25 RESPONSE and Objection to re5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Hernandez filed by James S. Martin. (bap) | |
24 | 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James S. Martin of Request for Production of Documents (bap) | |
23 | 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James S. Martin of Response and Objection to Defendant Hernandez' Motion to Dismiss (bap) | |
22 | 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Centurion Incorporated Responses to Plaintiff's First set of Requests for Production of Documents (White, Geoffrey) | |
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
21 | 21 NOTICE by FNU Hernandez re16 Response to Motion,17 Response to Motion Defendant Hernandez's Notice of Joinder in Defendant Centurion of New Mexico, LLC's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Doc. 16) and Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Sever Claims (Doc. 17) (Cormier, Zachary) | |
20 | 20 NOTICE by FNU Hernandez Notice of Withdrawal (Gooch, Christina) | |
19 | 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary R Cormier on behalf of FNU Hernandez (Cormier, Zachary) | |
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
18 | 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING10 Defendant New Mexico Corrections Department's Motion for Extension of Time, and GRANTING12 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. NMCD's responsive pleading is due no later than September 14, 2017 . Plaintiff's responses to4 Defendant Centurion's Motion to Dismiss and5 Defendant Hernandez's Motion to Dismiss are due no later than September 18, 2017 . (am) | |
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
17 | 17 RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION to Sever filed by Centurion Incorporated. (White, Geoffrey) | |
16 | 16 RESPONSE to Motion re6 MOTION to Certify filed by Centurion Incorporated. (White, Geoffrey) | |
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15 NOTICE by New Mexico Corrections Department re returned mail (Ganz, Paula) | |
14 | 14 NOTICE by New Mexico Corrections Department of Consent to Removal (Ganz, Paula) | |
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
13 | 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re6 MOTION to Certify,8 MOTION for Order,7 MOTION to Sever. Mail sent to James S. Martin (meq) | |
12 | 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Hernandez's Motion to Dismiss by James S. Martin. (meq) | |
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula E. Ganz on behalf of New Mexico Corrections Department (Ganz, Paula) | |
10 | 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by New Mexico Corrections Department. (Ganz, Paula) | |
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 AFFIDAVIT of Johnny Jackson re6 MOTION to Certify by James S. Martin (kg) | |
Att: 1 Affidavit of Marvin Murphy | ||
8 | 8 REQUEST for Jury Trial by James S. Martin. (kg) | |
7 | 7 MOTION to Sever Claims and Remand by James S. Martin. (kg) | |
6 | 6 MOTION to Certify Cause as a Class Action Suit by James S. Martin. (kg) | |
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Hernandez's Motion to Dismiss by FNU Hernandez. (Gooch, Christina) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Gloria Hernandez, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Warden Ricardo Martinez | ||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Centurion Incorporated. (White, Geoffrey) | |
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. (vv) | |
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE by Centurion, Inc. of Filing State Court Record (White, Geoffrey) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Centurion, Inc. from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2017-01443. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Centurion, Inc..(White, Geoffrey) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-5315699 re1 Notice of Removal filed by Centurion, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(White, Geoffrey) | ||
United States Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (ln) | ||
Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces) (Otero County). (ln) |