SCG Gracewood, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 8:17-bk-06562
Lead case is: 8:17-bk-06562
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Catherine Peek Mcewen |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-06564 |
Case Filed: | Jul 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
SCG Gracewood, LLC
1240 Marbella Plaza Dr
Tampa, FL 33619-7906 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago |
Sunday, December 31, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
Mon 01/01 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order . Notice Date 12/31/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Final Decree - Chapter 11
Fri 12/29 7:42 AM
Final Decree . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Ryan S.) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 12/29 7:42 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Ryan S.) |
||
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Notice Of Change of Address - Party
Fri 12/13 7:24 AM
Notice of Change of Address As to Noticing Address Only Filed by Creditor Morton Plant Hospital. (Sabrina) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Refund of Fee Payment
Wed 08/22 11:14 AM
Order Granting Motion for Refund of Fee Payment . Service Instructions: Stuart Weissman is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Sabrina) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Tue 08/21 2:30 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 9/4/2018 9:30 am Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Motion for Refund of Fee Payment Doc18 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Stuart J Weissman is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. . (Dkt) |
||
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Motion for Refund of Fee Payment
Fri 08/17 1:59 PM
Motion for Refund of Fee Payment Filed by Stuart J Weissman on behalf of Creditor Darby Jones (Weissman, Stuart) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
court
Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Required (SB)
Thu 08/02 10:39 AM
ERROR NOTIFICATION to Stuart Weissman for filing in the wrong case. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS FILING, . (Sabrina) |
||
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Motion for Relief from Stay (not for amended motions)
Wed 08/01 2:44 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay (Verify Fee) Filed by Stuart J Weissman on behalf of Creditor Darby Jones (Weissman, Stuart) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Wed 08/01 2:47 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief From Stay(8:17-bk-06564-CPM) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 181.00). Receipt Number 57876238, Amount Paid $ 181.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)
Mon 10/09 1:54 PM
Amended Schedule A/B, and Amended Summary Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor SCG Gracewood, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate Of Service
Thu 08/24 4:32 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Commencement of Case Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor SCG Gracewood, LLC . (Stichter, Scott) |
|
14 | 14
misc
SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)
Thu 08/24 4:30 PM
Summary of Assets , Schedules A - H, Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required., Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor SCG Gracewood, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Thu 08/24 4:53 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Schedules (all schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)(8:17-bk-06564-CPM) [misc,schaja] ( 31.00). Receipt Number 54666013, Amount Paid $ 31.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Fri 08/04 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest . Notice Date 08/03/2017. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 08/04 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 08/03/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 08/03 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 08/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Wed 08/02 2:10 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Corporate parents added to case: Senior Care Group, Inc.. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor SCG Gracewood, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Equity Security Holders
Wed 08/02 2:08 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor SCG Gracewood, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
Notice Of Deficient Filing
Tue 08/01 7:27 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Summary of Assets, Schedules A,B, D-H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Case Management Summary, Corporate Ownership Statement . (Ahyen) |
|
7 | 7
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Tue 08/01 7:23 AM
Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/30/2017 at 02:30 PM at Tampa, FL (861) - Room 100-B, Timberlake Annex, 501 E. Polk Street. Proofs of Claims due by 11/13/2017. (Ahyen) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Joint Administration
Mon 07/31 7:38 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration . This case is associated with lead case 8:17-bk-6562-CPM. . Service Instructions: Scott Stichter is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Christiane) |
|
court
(NO PAPER) - Notice Of Consolidation/Joint Administration of Cases
Mon 07/31 8:37 AM
Notice of Joint Administration of Cases. No further papers to be docketed in this case. All papers should be docketed in Case No. 8:17-bk-6562-CPM An Order has been entered in this case under Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chaper 11 cases of Senior Care Group, Inc. and SCG Gracewood, LLC. The docket of In re: Senior Care Group, Inc. Case No. 8:17-bk-06562-CPM should be consulted for all matters affecting this chapter 11 case . (Christiane) |
||
misc
Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY)
Mon 07/31 6:23 PM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor SCG Gracewood, LLC . (Stichter, Scott) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business
Fri 07/28 9:15 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 07/28 3:28 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Nathan A Carney on behalf of Creditor Healthcare Services Group, Inc.. (Carney, Nathan) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Motion for Joint Administration
Fri 07/28 10:10 AM
Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 8:17-bk-6562-CPM with 8:17-bk-6563-CPM; 8:17-bk-6564-CPM; 8:17-bk-6572-CPM; 8:17-bk-6576-CPM; 8:17-bk-6579-CPM; and 8:17-bk-6580-CPM Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor SCG Gracewood, LLC (Stichter, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Fri 07/28 9:54 AM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor SCG Gracewood, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) |
|
assign
Assign Judge and Trustee to Electronically Filed Cases
Fri 07/28 8:23 AM
Assignment of the Honorable Catherine Peek McEwen, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee . (Ellen M.) |
||
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Fri 07/28 9:48 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:17-bk-06564) [misc,volp11a2] (1717.00). Receipt Number 54391375, Amount Paid $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
25
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 07/27 4:18 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. Health Care Business. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of SCG Gracewood, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) |
|
court
Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Thu 07/27 9:01 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |