Key West Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 8:17-bk-06562
Lead case is: 8:17-bk-06562
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Catherine Peek Mcewen |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-06580 |
Case Filed: | Jul 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2023 |
Plan Confirmed: | Dec 10, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Key West Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
1240 Marbella Plaza Dr
Tampa, FL 33619-7906 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago |
Sunday, December 31, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
Mon 01/01 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order . Notice Date 12/31/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Final Decree - Chapter 11
Fri 12/29 7:49 AM
Final Decree . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Ryan S.) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 12/29 7:50 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Ryan S.) |
||
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)
Mon 10/09 1:51 PM
Amended Schedule A/B, and Amended Summary Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Key West Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate Of Service
Thu 08/24 4:40 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Commencement of Case Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Key West Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC . (Stichter, Scott) |
|
14 | 14
misc
SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)
Thu 08/24 4:39 PM
Summary of Assets , Schedules A - H, Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required., Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Key West Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Thu 08/24 4:53 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Schedules (all schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)(8:17-bk-06580-CPM) [misc,schaja] ( 31.00). Receipt Number 54666013, Amount Paid $ 31.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Fri 08/04 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest . Notice Date 08/03/2017. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 08/04 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 08/03/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 08/03 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 08/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Wed 08/02 2:15 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Corporate parents added to case: Senior Care Group, Inc.. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Key West Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Equity Security Holders
Wed 08/02 2:14 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Key West Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Joint Administration
Tue 08/01 9:33 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 8:17-bk-6562-CPM with 8:17-bk-6563-CPM; 8:17-bk-6564-CPM; 8:17-bk-6572-CPM; 8:17-bk-6576-CPM; 8:17-bk-6579-CPM . This case is associated with lead case 8:17-bk-6562. . Service Instructions: Scott Stichter is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Sabrina) |
|
7 | 7
court
Notice Of Deficient Filing
Tue 08/01 7:42 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Summary of Assets, Schedules A,B, D-H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Case Management Summary, Corporate Ownership Statement . (Ahyen) |
|
6 | 6
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Tue 08/01 7:41 AM
Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/30/2017 at 02:30 PM at Tampa, FL (861) - Room 100-B, Timberlake Annex, 501 E. Polk Street. Proofs of Claims due by 11/13/2017. (Ahyen) |
|
court
(NO PAPER) - Notice Of Consolidation/Joint Administration of Cases
Tue 08/01 9:39 AM
Notice of Joint Administration of Cases. No further papers to be docketed in this case. All papers should be docketed in Case No. 8:17-bk-6562-CPM (The Clerk shall maintain separate claims files, ballot files (if separate plans are filed), and claims registers for each Bankruptcy Case) . (Sabrina) |
||
misc
Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY)
Tue 08/01 9:53 AM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Key West Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC . (Stichter, Scott) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business
Fri 07/28 9:15 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 07/28 3:34 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Nathan A Carney on behalf of Creditor Healthcare Services Group, Inc.. (Carney, Nathan) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Motion for Joint Administration
Fri 07/28 10:15 AM
Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 8:17-bk-6562-CPM with 8:17-bk-6563-CPM; 8:17-bk-6564-CPM; 8:17-bk-6572-CPM; 8:17-bk-6576-CPM; 8:17-bk-6579-CPM; and 8:17-bk-6580-CPM Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Key West Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Stichter, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Fri 07/28 9:52 AM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Key West Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) |
|
assign
Assign Judge and Trustee to Electronically Filed Cases
Fri 07/28 8:27 AM
Assignment of the Honorable Catherine Peek McEwen, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee . (Ellen M.) |
||
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Fri 07/28 9:48 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:17-bk-06580) [misc,volp11a2] (1717.00). Receipt Number 54391375, Amount Paid $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
18
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 07/27 5:30 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. Health Care Business. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Key West Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) |
|
court
Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Thu 07/27 9:01 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |