Martin v. Sunbeam Products Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Rosemary Marquez |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00363 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 22, 2018 1:27 AM MST |
Defendant
Sunbeam Products Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Donna Martin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Wed 06/20 2:37 PM
ORDER that the Stipulation for Dismissal (Doc.37 ) is approved. The above-captioned matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear her or its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 6/19/2018. (MFR) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 06/19 9:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Sunbeam Products Incorporated.(Rappazzo, Jonah) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 05/08 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Sunbeam Products Incorporated. (Rappazzo, Jonah) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses
Thu 04/19 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Sunbeam Products Incorporated. (Rappazzo, Jonah) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 04/10 3:06 PM
ORDER granting33 Second Stipulated Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines (see attached Order for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 4/9/2018. (MFR) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Stipulation
Thu 04/05 2:11 PM
STIPULATION Second Stipulated Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Sunbeam Products Incorporated.(Rappazzo, Jonah) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Second Stipulated Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines | ||
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 03/09 1:09 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Extension of Time Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines (see attached Orders for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 3/8/2018. (MFR) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 03/07 2:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Sunbeam Products Incorporated.(Rappazzo, Jonah) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Mon 02/26 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Sunbeam Products Incorporated. (Rappazzo, Jonah) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Deposition
Mon 02/26 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Donna Martin, filed by Sunbeam Products Incorporated. (Rappazzo, Jonah) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Fri 01/26 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Sunbeam Products Incorporated. (Rappazzo, Jonah) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses
Fri 01/26 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) 1st Supplemental filed by Plaintiff Donna Martin. (Schmidt, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 12/20 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Donna Martin. (Schmidt, Matthew) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
Mon 12/18 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Sunbeam Products Incorporated. (Rappazzo, Jonah) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Thu 11/16 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Sunbeam Products Incorporated. (Rappazzo, Jonah) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 11/08 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Donna Martin. (Schmidt, Matthew) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses
Mon 11/06 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Sunbeam Products Incorporated. (Rappazzo, Jonah) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 10/04 3:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/27/2018. Dispositive motions due by 8/31/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 10/4/17. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 10/03 3:55 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman: Scheduling Conference held on 10/3/2017. The Court confirms reading the joint report filed. No issues to report by the parties at this time. The option of settlement conferences is discussed. APPEARANCES: Matthew Schmidt present for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Jonah Rappazzo for Defendant. Hearing held 11:00 to 11:06. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ABU) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP
Thu 09/21 10:35 AM
Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Donna Martin. (Schmidt, Matthew) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
5
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 09/15 1:58 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER pursuant to16 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 9/14/17.(BAC) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses
Fri 09/15 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Sunbeam Products Incorporated. (Rappazzo, Jonah) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation
Wed 09/13 1:17 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order by Sunbeam Products Incorporated.(Osborne, James) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order | ||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
Fri 09/08 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Sunbeam Products Incorporated. (Rappazzo, Jonah) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
Tue 09/05 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Donna Martin. (Schmidt, Matthew) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP
Tue 09/05 3:24 PM
Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Donna Martin. (Schmidt, Matthew) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 08/11 1:46 PM
ORDER, Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2017 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman. Parties are directed to confer at least 21 days prior to the conference and counsel shall file with the Court, not less than seven calendar days before the Scheduling Conference, a joint report reflecting the results of their discussion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 8/11/17. (KAH) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 08/09 3:29 PM
ORDER granting extension of time until 8/9/17 to respond to complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 8/9/17. (KAH) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant
Wed 08/09 1:59 PM
DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Sunbeam Products Incorporated. (Osborne, James) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/09 1:56 PM
Defendant Sunbeam Products, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Sunbeam Products Incorporated.(Osborne, James) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation
Mon 08/07 1:58 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman for all pretrial proceedings and a Report and Recommendation. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV 17-00363 TUC-RM (LAB). Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 8/7/17. (KAH) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Assignment of Case to DJ (After Consent)
Fri 08/04 4:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule Civ 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. Case reassigned by random draw to District Judge, Rosemary Marquez. All further pleadings should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV17-363-TUC-RM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC) |
|
6 | 6
misc
25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge
Fri 08/04 3:50 PM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Wed 08/02 3:49 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re:1 Notice of Removal by Sunbeam Products Incorporated.(Osborne, James) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)
Thu 07/27 12:45 PM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 07/27 12:44 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14478090. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Leslie A Bowman. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:CV-17-363-TUC-LAB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to return the attached Magistrate Election form, in paper, within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (DLC) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/27 12:42 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sunbeam Products Incorporated. (Osborne, James) (DLC) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/27 12:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20172783. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14478090 filed by Sunbeam Products Incorporated. (Osborne, James)(DLC) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |