Steven Wayne Bonilla v. Ronald Davis
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-05536 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Fri 08/11 1:10 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Northern District, 4:17-cv-04513 filed 8/11/2017. (yl) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Transferring Case
Tue 08/01 1:44 PM
ORDER Transferring Action to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court transfer this matter to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court serve a copy of this Order on Petitioner and the California Attorney General. (See Order for details). Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bem) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form
Fri 07/28 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car) |
|
Att: 1 CV-111 Notice Re: Discrepancies for Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)
Fri 07/28 12:30 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth.(Filing fee $ 5. FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner Steven Wayne Bonilla. (car) |