Bull Taco, LLC
California Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher B Latham |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-04535 |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Sep 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 27, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Bull Taco, LLC
101 S. Coast Hwy
Encinitas, CA 92024 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Aug 04, 2017 8:16 AM PDT |
United States Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 880 Front Street Suite 3230
San Diego, CA 92101 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago |
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
59 | 59
order
Closing Chapter 11 Dismissed Case
Mon 11/27 8:13 AM
Order Closing Case. An order dismissing has been entered by the Court, and notice of the dismissal has been given to the debtor(s) and all creditors and all other required documentation having been entered; therefore, IT IS ORDERED that the within case be and the same is hereby closed . Barry K. Lander, Clerk (Lewis, L.) |