Stand 2, LLC
Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kathy A Surratt-States |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-45233 |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Sep 27, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Stand 2, LLC
7700 Forsyth Blvd. Suite 1230
Saint Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Aug 04, 2017 10:17 AM CDT |
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago |
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 09/07 1:29 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (nel, k) |
||
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/30 11:07 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC . (Desai, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix | ||
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 08/29 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/29/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
court
Motion and Order Approving Substitution of Attorney
Mon 08/27 3:12 PM
Motion and Order Approving Substitution of Attorney Paul A. Randolph on behalf of Leonora S. Long. (ber, d) |
|
Saturday, August 25, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 08/25 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/25/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
Final Decree
Thu 08/23 12:31 PM
Order Granting Motion For Final Decree (kru, l) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Final Decree
Thu 06/07 2:46 PM
Motion for Final Decree Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC (Desai, Spencer) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Support/Supplement
Wed 09/27 2:16 PM
Support/Supplement Re: Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC . (Desai, Spencer) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 09/27 2:12 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC . (Desai, Spencer) |
|
29 | 29
order
Confirming Chapter 11 Plan
Wed 09/27 10:00 AM
Order Confirming Chapter 11 Pre-Confirmation Plan . (daw, j) |
|
28 | 28
order
Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens
Wed 09/27 9:53 AM
Order Granting Motion To Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens (daw, j) |
|
27 | 27
order
Employ
Wed 09/27 9:50 AM
Order Granting Application to Employ (daw, j) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Affidavit
Mon 09/18 9:43 AM
Affidavit Re: Robert O'Brien in Support of Confirmation Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC. (Desai, Spencer) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Chapter 11 Ballots
Mon 09/18 9:41 AM
Chapter 11 Ballots Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC. (Desai, Spencer) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Held
Thu 09/07 1:44 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded. Trustee certifies debtor provided payment advices or other documents required under 11 U.S.C. 521(a)(1)(B)(iv), if applicable. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of US Trustee. (Long, Leonora) |
||
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/22 1:08 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC . (Desai, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Mailing Matrix | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 08/22 1:05 PM
Notice of Hearing on Confirmation of Plan and Notice of Deadline for Objections to Adequacy of Combined Plan and Disclosure Statement Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC . Hearing to be held on 9/18/2017 at 11:00 AM Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North for22 , (Desai, Spencer) |
|
22 | 22
plan
Chapter 11 Plan
Tue 08/22 1:03 PM
Disclosure Statement Combined Disclosure Statement and Plan of Liquidation Dated August 21, 2017 , Chapter 11 Plan. Certificate of Service: no. Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC. (Desai, Spencer) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/17 11:17 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC . (Desai, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Mailing Matrix | ||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/15 9:35 AM
Scheduling Order . Hearing to be held on 9/18/2017 at 11:00 AM Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North for10 , (daw, j) |
|
19 | 19
order
Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim
Tue 08/15 9:08 AM
Order Granting Motion To Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Proofs of Claims due by 10/2/2017. (daw, j) |
|
18 | 18
order
Generic Order
Tue 08/15 9:06 AM
Order Granting Motion (10 Amended Motion to Establish Bid Procedures filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC) (daw, j) |
|
17 | 17
order
Interim Order
Tue 08/15 8:55 AM
Interim Order . Hearing scheduled 9/18/2017 at 11:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (daw, j) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
crditcrd
none
Mon 08/07 12:20 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under 11 USC 363(f) 17-45233 [motion,msellfc] ( 181.00). Receipt number 14093793, amount $ 181.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 08/07 12:17 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC . Hearing to be held on 9/18/2017 at 11:00 AM Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North for14 , (Desai, Spencer) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under 11 USC 363(f)
Mon 08/07 12:16 PM
Motion to Sell Property: Intellectual Property Free and Clear of Liens under 11 USC 363(f). Fee Amount $181,. Certificate of Service: Yes. Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC Hearing scheduled 9/18/2017 at 11:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Desai, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Sunday, August 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 08/06 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 08/06/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Fri 08/04 12:59 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/5/2017 at 11:00 AM at U.S. Trustee Meeting Room, Suite 6.365A. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/6/2017. (rad, t) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim
Fri 08/04 12:14 PM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC (jer, j) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Generic Motion
Thu 08/03 4:23 PM
Amended Motion to Establish Bid Procedures Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC Hearing scheduled 8/14/2017 at 11:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Desai, Spencer) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Balance Sheet
Thu 08/03 3:53 PM
Balance Sheet and Financial Statments Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1116(1)(A) Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC. (Desai, Spencer) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 08/03 3:49 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC . Hearing to be held on 8/14/2017 at 11:00 AM Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North for7 , (Desai, Spencer) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Generic Motion
Thu 08/03 3:48 PM
Motion to Establish Bid Procedures Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC Hearing scheduled 8/14/2017 at 11:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Desai, Spencer) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Generic Motion
Thu 08/03 3:45 PM
Motion to Establish Claims Bar Date Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC (Desai, Spencer) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Employ
Thu 08/03 3:42 PM
Application to Employ Carmody MacDonald PC as Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Stand 2, LLC Hearing scheduled 8/14/2017 at 11:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Desai, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Spencer P. Desai | ||
4 | 4
misc
Correspondence
Thu 08/03 2:25 PM
Correspondence Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of US Trustee. (Long, Leonora) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 08/02 12:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of all Notices, Pleadings, Papers, and Orders by Leonora S. Long Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of US Trustee. (Long, Leonora) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 07/31 3:36 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-45233 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 14074159, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
31
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 11)
Mon 07/31 3:33 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Stand 2, LLC Government Proof of Claim due by 01/27/2018. Small Business Plan due by 01/27/2018. Small Business Disclosure Statement due by 01/27/2018. (Desai, Spencer) |