Imperial Palms Resort, LLC
California Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Margaret M Mann |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-04553 |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2017 |
Dismissed: | May 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Imperial Palms Resort, LLC
2275 Huntington Drive, Ste. 534
San Marino, CA 91108 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Aug 04, 2017 8:15 AM PDT |
United States Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 880 Front Street Suite 3230
San Diego, CA 92101 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/30/2017 5:00 PM PDT |
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
50
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (fee) - case upload
Mon 07/31 3:40 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals, Schedules & Statements Fee Amount $ 1717.00 filed by John L. Smaha of Smaha Law Group, APC on behalf of Imperial Palms Resort, LLC. Declaration re: ECF due by 8/14/2017, (Smaha, John) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Mon 07/31 3:41 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition([LINK 17-04553 11] ) [misc,1032u] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 1717.00 Receipt number A13369654 ; (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (CSD 1801)
Mon 07/31 3:42 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by John L. Smaha on behalf of Imperial Palms Resort, LLC. (Smaha, John) |