A & A Granite and Limestone, LLC
Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brenda T Rhoades |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-41678 |
Case Filed: | Aug 01, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Jul 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
A & A Granite and Limestone, LLC
313 Hawthorne Drive
Murphy, TX 75094 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Aug 04, 2017 10:19 AM CDT |
Creditor
McKillican Dallas
1536 Hutton Drive, Suite 150
Carrollton, TX 75006 |
|
Creditor
Walker Zanger
8901 Bradley Ave.
Sun Valley, CA 91352 |
|
Creditor
Vicostone Quartz Surfaces
11620 Goodnight Lane Suite 100
Dallas, TX 75229 |
|
Creditor
Lane Gorman Trubitt
2626 Howell Street, Suite 700
Dallas, TX 75204 |
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
Kimberly A. Walsh c/o Sherri K. Simpson, Paralegal P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Synergy Bank
8951 Synergy Drive
McKinney, TX 75070 |
|
Creditor
Stone Channel
1441 S. Beltline, Suite 200
Coppell, TX 75019 |
|
Creditor
Everest Stone
15565 Wright Brothers Drive
Addison, TX 75001 |
|
Creditor
Soci
718 S. Greenville Suite 190
Allen, TX 75002 |
|
Creditor
Cutler Smith
12750 Merit Drive Suite 1450
Dallas, TX 75251 |
|
Creditor
Rockwall Central Appraisal District
841 Justin Road
Rockwall, TX 75087 |
|
Creditor
Pristine Environmental
P.O. Box 610
Saint Joseph, MN 56374 |
|
Creditor
NTTA Toll Tag
P.O. Box 260928
Plano, TX 75026 |
|
Creditor
Louisiana Stone
P.O. Box 6050
Monroe, LA 71211 |
|
Creditor
KLZ Diamond Tools
P.O. Box 180129
Dallas, TX 75218 |
|
Creditor
Internal Revenue Service
1100 Commerce St. 5024 DAL
Dallas, TX 75242 |
|
Creditor
IGM
2038 83rd Street P.O. Box 3
North Bergen, NJ 07047 |
|
Creditor
Harrell Pailet & Associates
5454 La Sierra, Suite 100
Dallas, TX 75231 |
|
Creditor
First Guaranty Bank
400 E. Thomas St.
Hammond, LA 70401 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cosentino Enterprises
1163 Emerald St. Suite 400
Dallas, TX 75229 |
|
Creditor
Capital One
P.O. Box 60599
City of Industry, CA 91716 |
|
Creditor
Artisian Masonry, Inc.
2501 Circle Drive
Royse City, TX 75189 |
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 07/25 1:40 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (slt) |