TerraVia Holdings, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11655 |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 07, 2020 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jan 08, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
TerraVia Holdings, Inc.
225 Gateway Boulevard
South San Francisco, CA 94080 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Aug 04, 2017 11:14 AM EDT |
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.com 2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bunge Global Innovation, LLC, Bunge Cooperatief UA, Bunge Acucar Bioenergia Ltda., and Bunge Alimentos S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Passport Capital
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Consortium of Holders of TerraVia Holdings, Inc. Convertible Senior Subordinated Notes
|
|
Interested Party
Corbion N.V. and certain of its affiliates
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as DIP Agent, and the Ad Hoc Consortium of Holders of TerraVia Holdings, Inc. Convertible Senior Subordinated Notes
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wilmington Trust, N.A., not in its individual capacity, but solely as successor Trustee under that certain Indenture with respect to 6% convertible senior subordinated notes due 2018
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
1. | TerraVia Files For Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (seekingalpha.com) |
Submitted Fri 08/04/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago |