Hoag Urgent Care-Tustin, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Theodor Albert |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-13077 |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Sep 18, 2018 |
Claims Deadline: | Dec 31, 2018 |
Converted: | Jun 29, 2018 |
Dismissed: | Mar 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Hoag Urgent Care-Tustin, Inc.
PO Box 8979
Newport Beach, CA 92658 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Aug 04, 2017 8:13 AM PDT |
Creditor
Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Newport Healthcare Center LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Opus Bank
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Interested Party
|
Represented By
|
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/08/2022 3:00 AM PDT |
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 08/02 12:22 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:17-bk-13077) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45318747. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
59
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 08/02 12:19 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Hoag Urgent Care-Tustin, Inc. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 08/16/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 08/16/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 08/16/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 08/16/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 08/16/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 08/16/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 08/16/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 08/16/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 08/16/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 08/16/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 08/16/2017.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 09/1/2017 (McDow, Ashley) |
|
2 | 2
17
pgs
motion
Joint Administration (motion)
Wed 08/02 8:25 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Notice of Ex Parte Motion and Ex Parte Motion for Joint Administration Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 105(a), Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1015, and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1015-1; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor Hoag Urgent Care-Tustin, Inc. (Delaney, Michael) |