Robert W. Ahlstrom v. DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-04383 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 29, 2018 1:33 AM PST |
Defendant
D.R. Horton, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert W. Ahlstrom
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 30 2018
ORDER GRANTING 28 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/30/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018) |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/10 5:25 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/10/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/05 12:37 PM
SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/5/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Fri 11/30 10:46 AM
ORDER GRANTING 28 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/30/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 11/15 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chaim Shaun Setareh of Farrah Grant (Setareh, Chaim) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 11/15 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chaim Shaun Setareh of Ashley N. Batiste (Setareh, Chaim) |
|
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 11/08 10:01 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2018 re 28 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed by D.R. Horton, Inc., DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc. Oral Argument Heard; Written Order to be issued. Total Time in Court: 15 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Chaim Setareh. Defendant Attorney: Jack Sholkoff. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/8/2018) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Tue 10/02 5:23 PM
REPLY filed byD.R. Horton, Inc., DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc.. (Aurisch, Alexandra) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Tue 09/25 4:14 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byRobert W. Ahlstrom. (Setareh, Chaim) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Status Report
Tue 09/18 5:15 PM
STATUS REPORT by Robert W. Ahlstrom. (Setareh, Chaim) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Status Report
Tue 09/18 3:45 PM
STATUS REPORT by D.R. Horton, Inc., DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc.. (Aurisch, Alexandra) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
oth_sup
Request for Judicial Notice
Tue 09/11 1:24 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re28 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed byD.R. Horton, Inc., DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc.. (Aurisch, Alexandra) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Compel
Tue 09/11 1:23 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed by D.R. Horton, Inc., DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 9/25/2018. Replies due by 10/2/2018.(Aurisch, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Alexandra C. Aurisch, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/28 6:46 PM
ORDER REQUESTING STATUS REPORT BY SEPTEMBER 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/28/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 06/12 3:02 PM
ORDER APPROVING 25 STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/12/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Status Report
Mon 06/11 5:10 PM
STATUS REPORT by D.R. Horton, Inc., DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc.. (Sholkoff, Jack) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
adr
ADR Remark
Thu 11/30 2:11 PM
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled on December 5, 2017 at 11:30 AM Pacific time is off calendar. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 11/27 11:00 AM
Hearings Vacated per23 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Order on Stipulation. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017) |
||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Stipulation
Tue 11/21 5:20 PM
ORDER GRANTING 22 STIPULATION STAYING CASE PENDING U.S. SUPREME COURT'S DECISION IN MORRIS V. ERNST & YOUNG, LLP; TERMINATING 12 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE; VACATING DECEMBER 7, 2017 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; VACATING MARCH 1, 2018 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/21/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 11/21 3:30 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Case filed by D.R. Horton, Inc., DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc.. (Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/21/2017) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
Mon 11/20 9:31 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on December 5, 2017, at 11:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
adr
Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
Fri 11/17 3:47 PM
NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 11/17/2017) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Thu 11/16 8:48 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/16/2017) |
|
18 | 18
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Thu 11/16 5:56 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 11/16/2017) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Mon 11/13 3:32 PM
REPLY filed byD.R. Horton, Inc., DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc..(Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Supplemental Declaration of David T. Morice | ||
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 11/10 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Steven Sholkoff as Counsel for Defendants DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc. and D.R. Horton, Inc. (Sholkoff, Jack) (Filed on 11/10/2017) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Fri 11/03 2:35 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byRobert W. Ahlstrom. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 11/3/2017) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 10/20 2:16 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by D.R. Horton, Inc., DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DHI Mortgage Company, Other Affiliate DHI Mortgage Company, Ltd. for DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc.. and Disclosure Statement (Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/20/2017) |
|
13 | 13
oth_sup
Request for Judicial Notice
Fri 10/20 2:14 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byD.R. Horton, Inc., DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc.. (Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/20/2017) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 10/20 2:13 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by D.R. Horton, Inc., DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/3/2017. Replies due by 11/13/2017.(Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/20/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Katz, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Paula Hunter-Perkins, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Brad Conlon, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Mark C. Winter, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of David T. Morice, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 10/05 1:35 PM
STIPULATION Enlarging Time to Respond to Operative Complaint filed by D.R. Horton, Inc., DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc.. (Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/5/2017) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/14 4:35 PM
NOTICE by Robert W. Ahlstrom of Consent to Join Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(B) (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 9/14/2017) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 08/18 10:22 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2017. Case Management Conference set for 12/07/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 08/15 2:28 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 8/15/2017.(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Tue 08/15 1:48 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 08/14 5:33 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert W. Ahlstrom.. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 8/14/2017) |
|
5 | 5
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 08/14 12:53 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/28/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/03 9:56 AM
Summons Issued as to D.R. Horton, Inc., DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc.. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017) |
|
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 08/03 9:53 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 08/03 6:24 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/02 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT against D.R. Horton, Inc., DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11597573.). Filed byRobert W. Ahlstrom.(Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 8/2/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |