Scayl, Inc.
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Dennis Montali |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-30757 |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Aug 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Debtor
Scayl, Inc.
2995 Woodside Rd Ste 400
Woodside, CA 94062-2448 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Barry Milgrom
60 29th St. PMB #661
San Francisco, CA 94110 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Docket last updated: 08/04/2017 12:02 AM PDT |
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Thu 08/03 2:28 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/30/2017 at 10:30 AM at Office of the U.S. Trustee Office 450. (Franklin, Robert) |
||
crditcrd
none
Thu 08/03 3:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-30757 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt number 27760998, amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 08/03 2:20 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $335. Filed by Scayl, Inc.. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 08/17/2017. (Franklin, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/03 2:49 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Ownership) Filed by Debtor Scayl, Inc. (Franklin, Robert) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Thu 08/03 2:57 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $ $5,000.00 Filed by Attorney Dorsey & Whitney LLP (Franklin, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
4 | 4
motion
Designate Responsible Individual
Thu 08/03 3:10 PM
Application to Designate Stephen R. Douty as Responsible Individual Filed by Debtor Scayl, Inc. (Franklin, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service |