Rushing et al v. The Walt Disney Company et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James Donato |
Referred: | Alex G Tse |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-04419 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 24, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 30, 2018 12:53 AM PST |
Defendant
Disney Electronic Content, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Disney Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kochava, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Walt Disney Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unity Technologies SF
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Upsight, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L. L.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Rushing
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed against The Walt Disney Company alleging it illegally tracked children via apps (gizmodo.com) |
Submitted Mon 08/07/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, December 30, 2020 | ||
156 | 156
misc
Transcript
Wed 12/30 3:33 PM
Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 12 17-2020 before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/30/2021. (Pas, Debra) |