10
|
|
10
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Tue 01/16 10:58 AM
NOTICE and ORDER Dismissing Case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/16/2018. (km)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 01/12 1:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by ANTECH DIAGNOSTICS, INC.. (RINGSTAD, ANDREAS)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
notice
Notice of Call for Dismissal
Tue 01/02 11:20 AM
Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 41.1(a). Motion set for 1/16/2017 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmm, )
Related: [-]
|
|
|
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 09/22 11:57 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to KATHLEEN STRYESKI, DVM, WINDSONG PET HEALING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AND DEERWOOD ANIMAL HOSPITAL CORP. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (kas, )
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
misc
Request for Default
Thu 09/21 11:02 AM
Request for Default by ANTECH DIAGNOSTICS, INC. against All Defendants.(RINGSTAD, ANDREAS)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Affidavit,
|
| |
Att: 2
Text of Proposed Order,
|
| |
Att: 3
Certificate of Service,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit
|
6
|
|
6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 09/08 1:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANTECH DIAGNOSTICS, INC.. DEERWOOD ANIMAL HOSPITAL CORP. served on 8/6/2017, answer due 8/28/2017. (RINGSTAD, ANDREAS)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 09/08 1:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANTECH DIAGNOSTICS, INC.. WINDSONG PET HEALING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY served on 8/15/2017, answer due 9/5/2017. (RINGSTAD, ANDREAS)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 09/08 1:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANTECH DIAGNOSTICS, INC.. KATHLEEN STRYESKI, DVM served on 8/15/2017, answer due 9/5/2017. (RINGSTAD, ANDREAS)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/10 11:55 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ANTECH DIAGNOSTICS, INC.. (RINGSTAD, ANDREAS)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/04 1:12 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to DEERWOOD ANIMAL HOSPITAL CORP., KATHLEEN STRYESKI, DVM, WINDSONG PET HEALING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 08/04 1:11 PM
COMPLAINT against DEERWOOD ANIMAL HOSPITAL CORP., KATHLEEN STRYESKI, DVM, WINDSONG PET HEALING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $400 receipt number 8006653) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ANTECH DIAGNOSTICS, INC..(jem)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Civil Cover Sheet
|
|
|
utility
Case Referred to Arbitration
Fri 08/04 1:11 PM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jem)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
qc
QC - Lack of Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/04 1:13 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jem)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
qc
QC - ACO re 33-1
Fri 08/04 1:13 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Effective July, 2017, attorneys must electronically open and file civil cases in CM/ECF. The case you electronically filed in 33-1 has been processed, however, use of 33-1 is being discontinued on August 14, 2017 so please familiarize yourself with the process. An Attorney Case Opening Guide, as well as other relevant documentation, can be found on our website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] or contact the ECF Assistance Line. (jem)
Related: [-]
|