Santana et al v. City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department et al
Washington Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rosanna Malouf Peterson |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03133 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 31, 2018 1:17 AM PST |
Defendant
E Rollinger
Sunnyside, WA 98944
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C Sparks
Sunnyside, WA 98944
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department
a Washington municipal corporation 401 Homer Street
Sunnyside, WA 98944 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
T Orth
Sunnyside, WA 98944
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
S Lemmon
Sunnyside, WA 98944
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
O Hernandez
Zillah, WA 98944
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Al Escalera
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe Nos. 1-30
|
|
Defendant
S Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KCS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ana M Santana
individually and on behalf of her marital community, if any P.O. Box 228
Zillah, WA 98953 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos D Santana
individually and on behalf of his marital community, if any P.O. Box 228
Zillah, WA 98953 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose B Santana
individually and on behalf of his marital community, if any P.O. Box 228
Zillah, WA 98953 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose G Santana
individually and on behalf of his marital community, if any P.O. Box 228
Zillah, WA 98953 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monica Santana
individually and on behalf of her marital community, if any P.O. Box 228
Zillah, WA 98953 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Noel A Santana
individually and on behalf of her marital community, if any P.O. Box 228
Zillah, WA 98953 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor E Santana
individually and on behalf of his marital community, if any P.O. Box 228
Zillah, WA 98953 |
Represented By
|
1. | Family sues City of Sunnyside, claims they were the victim of a harassment campaign (yakimaherald.com) |
Submitted Wed 08/16/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 01/16 10:27 AM
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 01/16 10:20 AM
ORDER GRANTING ECF No.19 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. FILE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply Memorandum
Wed 12/20 11:52 AM
REPLY MEMORANDUM re19 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Reply Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by S Bailey, City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department, Al Escalera, O Hernandez, S Lemmon, T Orth, E Rollinger, C Sparks. (Ehlis, Kirk) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Mon 11/20 9:02 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by S Bailey, City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department, Al Escalera, O Hernandez, S Lemmon, T Orth, E Rollinger, C Sparks. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2018 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson.(Ehlis, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 10/20 9:44 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C Sparks, S Lemmon, T Orth, City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department, E Rollinger, S Bailey, O Hernandez, Al Escalera re City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department. (Ehlis, Kirk) |
|
17 | 17
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 10/20 9:42 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C Sparks, S Lemmon, T Orth, City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department, E Rollinger, S Bailey, O Hernandez, Al Escalera re O Hernandez. (Ehlis, Kirk) |
|
16 | 16
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 10/20 9:42 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C Sparks, S Lemmon, T Orth, City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department, E Rollinger, S Bailey, O Hernandez, Al Escalera re T Orth. (Ehlis, Kirk) |
|
15 | 15
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 10/20 9:40 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C Sparks, S Lemmon, T Orth, City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department, E Rollinger, S Bailey, O Hernandez, Al Escalera re S Lemmon. (Ehlis, Kirk) |
|
14 | 14
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 10/20 9:39 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C Sparks, S Lemmon, T Orth, City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department, E Rollinger, S Bailey, O Hernandez, Al Escalera re E Rollinger. (Ehlis, Kirk) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 10/20 9:38 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C Sparks, S Lemmon, T Orth, City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department, E Rollinger, S Bailey, O Hernandez, Al Escalera re C Sparks. (Ehlis, Kirk) Modified on 10/20/2017 to correct event type (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 10/20 9:37 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C Sparks, S Lemmon, T Orth, City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department, E Rollinger, S Bailey, O Hernandez, Al Escalera re Al Escalera. (Ehlis, Kirk) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 10/20 9:35 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C Sparks, S Lemmon, T Orth, City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department, E Rollinger, S Bailey, O Hernandez, Al Escalera re S Bailey. (Ehlis, Kirk) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 10/17 4:44 PM
JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/20/2018 09:30 AM in Yakima Courtroom 324 Teleconference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 01:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 901 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. Jury Trial set for 1/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 324 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
9 | 9
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 10/17 3:34 PM
Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson: Scheduling Conference held on 10/17/2017. (MF, Courtroom Deputy) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Joint Certificate - LR 26.1 / LR 16.1
Mon 10/02 2:56 PM
Joint Certificate Pursuant to LR 26.1 / LR 16.1 by S Bailey, City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department, Al Escalera, O Hernandez, S Lemmon, T Orth, E Rollinger, C Sparks. (Ehlis, Kirk) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Scheduling Conference Notice
Tue 09/12 2:17 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Telephonic Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/31 1:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by S Bailey, City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department, Al Escalera, O Hernandez, S Lemmon, T Orth, E Rollinger, C Sparks.(Ehlis, Kirk) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/17 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk A Ehlis on behalf of S Bailey, City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department, Al Escalera, O Hernandez, S Lemmon, T Orth, E Rollinger, C Sparks (Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party S Bailey(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party City of Sunnyside, Sunnyside Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party Al Escalera(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party O Hernandez(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party S Lemmon(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party T Orth(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party E Rollinger(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party C Sparks(pty:dft))(Ehlis, Kirk) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/09 8:33 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (TR, Case Administrator) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 08/05 12:02 AM
COMPLAINT FOR CIVIL RIGHTS VIOLATIONS AND DAMAGES; PUNITIVE DAMAGES. ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-2677007) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs.(Sandlin, J) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet (civil rights claims), | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 08/07 12:18 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator) |